Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB467 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/07/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Nikki Swope 
LB 467 DATE PREPARED: January 28, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0042 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 467 relates to the Utilization Review Act to require a health carrier or utilization review agent to implement and maintain a prior 
authorization application programming interface pursuant to 45 C.F.R. 156.223(b)	, as such regulation existed on January 1, 2025. The 
Act is to be in effect on January 1, 2028. The bill would not apply to the prior authorization request for coverage of drugs , as defined in 
45 C.F.R. 156.221(b)(1)(v). 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 467                 AM:                           AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Insurance 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                DATE: 1/28/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: The Department of Insurance’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 467, appears reasonable. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 467 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Insurance 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jordan Blades Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/24/24 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4638 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
The Department does not anticipate any fiscal impact at this time.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....