Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB479 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/27/2025

                    PREPARED BY: John Wiemer 
LB 479 DATE PREPARED: February 27, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0051 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS  ($80,914,000)  ($125,154,000) 
CASH FUNDS See Below $68,777,000 See Below $106,381,000 
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS See Below ($12,137,000) See Below ($18,773,000) 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 479 amends section 77-27,132 	to provide that for transactions occurring on or after October 1, 2025 and before July 1, 2042, of the 
proceeds of the sales and use taxes derived from transactions other than those listed in subdivisions (2)(a), (b), 	(e) of the section from 
a sales tax rate of 0.5%, a change from 0.25%, cr	edit monthly 85% to the Highway Trust Fund and 15% to the Highway Allocation 
Fund. 
 
The Department of Revenue (DOR) estimates the following impact to revenues as a result of the bill: 
 
 
 
There is estimated to be a revenue increase to the Highway Trust Fund and the Highway Allocation Fund, w	hich is distributed to cities 
and counties. 
 
The DOR estimates no costs to it as a result of the bill. 
 
The Nebraska Department of Transportation (NDOT) estimates Cash Fund increases that are from the DOR. NDOT notes the increase 
in revenues would result in more funding available for NDOT highway construction projects, such as for expansion of the expressway 
system, and to the Highway Allocation Fund for cities and counties. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET D IVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  479           AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Revenue 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE:  2/26/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471 -4178 
COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Revenue 	assessment of fiscal impact from 	LB 479 and no fiscal impact to the 
agency. 
  
  LB 0479 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 02/26/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds  $(80,914,000)   $(125,154,000)   $(129,020,000) 
Cash Funds  $68,777,000   $106,381,000   $109,667,000 
Federal Funds         
Other Funds  $12,137,000   $18,773,000   $19,353,000 
Total Funds  $ 0   $ 0   $ 0 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total…………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
 
Beginning October 1, 2025, LB 479 changes the Revenue Distribution Fund credit for certain sales of one-quarter 
of one percent to one-half of one percent from the sales tax rate to the Highway Trust Fund and Highway 
Allocation Fund.  
 
The estimated fiscal impact of LB 479 to the General Fund revenues, Highway Trust Fund, and Highway 
Allocation Fund are as follows: 
 
  
General Fund 
Revenues 
Highway Trust 
Fund  
Highway 
Allocation Fund 
FY25-26  $    (80,914,000)  $   68,777,000   $      12,137,000  
FY26-27  $  (125,154,000)  $ 106,381,000   $      18,773,000  
FY27-28  $  (129,020,000)  $ 109,667,000   $      19,353,000  
FY28-29  $  (133,080,000)  $ 113,118,000   $      19,962,000  
 It is estimated that there will be no cost for the Department of Revenue to implement LB 479.   Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 479 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Transportation 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jenessa Boynton Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/24/25 Phone: 
(5)
 402-479-4691 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
See below   $68,777,000   See below   $106,381,000 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
  $12,137,000    $18,773,000 
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
See below   $80,914,000   See below   $125,154,000 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
As proposed, LB479 would change the distr ibution of sales and use taxes proceeds for certain transactions 
from one- quarter of one percent to one-half of one percent beginning October 1, 2025.  Credit of the one-	half 
of one percent will continue to be applied at eight five percent to the Nebraska Department of Transportation 
(NDOT) through the Highway Trust Fund 	and fifteen percent to cities and counties through the Highway 
Allocation Fund. 
 
Revenue to Build Nebraska Act Funds 
 	FY2025-26 FY2026-27 FY2027-28 FY2028-29 
Highway Trust Fund (NDOT) 	$68,777,000 $106,381,000 $109,667,000 $113,118,000 
Highway Allocation Fund (cities and counties) $12,137,000 $18,773,000 $19,353,000 $19,962,000 
 
This estimate of increased tax revenue is from the Nebraska Department of Revenue.  The increase in 
revenue in Build Nebraska Act Funds will result in more funding available 	for NDOT highway construction 
projects, such as for expansion of the expressway system, and to the Highway Allocation Fund for cities and 
counties. 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITU	RE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....