Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB496 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/24/2025

                     
 
PREPARED BY: Shelly Glaser 
LB 496 DATE PREPARED: February 21, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0052 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB496 amends Nebraska §60 -6,111 to adopt new protections for the 	riding or leading of livestock on or across highways.  The bill 
defines livestock as a horse, mule, donkey, cattle, swine, sheep, or goat.  Specific rules for motor vehicle operators who come upon 
livestock being led on highways are stated as follows: 
 
1. Drivers must use caution when approaching or passing people herding livestock; 
 
2. Promptly stop if the livestock handler raises a hand as a distress signal (unless stopping would cause an accident) ; 
 
3. Turn off their vehicle's engine if requested by the livestock handler; and 
 
4. Yield the right of way to livestock on the highway. 
 
 
The Nebraska Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) and the Nebraska State Patrol (NSP) have both indicated no fiscal impact. 
 
There is no basis to disagree with these estimates of no fiscal impact. 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 496               AM:                            AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Patrol 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/4/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the State Patrol’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 496.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 496                   AM:                      AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Motor Vehicles 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/28/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Motor Vehicles assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 496.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ST ATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 496               AM:                                               AGENCY/POLT. SUB: : Nebraska Department of Transportation 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 2/21/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: Nebraska Department of Transportation’s assessment of no net fiscal impact from LB 496 appears 
reasonable. 
   
   Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 496 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Motor Vehicles 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Bart Moore 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 23, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-3902 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No Fiscal Impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR O	BJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 496 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska State Patrol 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Carol Aversman Date Prepared: 
(4)
 01/29/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4545 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION                                  
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
NO FISCAL IMPACT 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 496 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Transportation 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jenessa Boynton Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/19/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-479-4691 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
LB496 proposes for additional measures to be taken by motorist when approaching or passing any per	son 
leading or herding livestock on the highway.  In addition, the bill would require a motorist to promptly stop the 
motor vehicle if a distressed signal of raising a hand is provided by the person leading the livestock 	or turn off 
the motor vehicle at requested of the person leading the livestock.  
 
No fiscal impact is anticipated to the Department	. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………… ……...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....