PREPARED BY: Shelly Glaser LB 496 DATE PREPARED: February 21, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0052 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB496 amends Nebraska §60 -6,111 to adopt new protections for the riding or leading of livestock on or across highways. The bill defines livestock as a horse, mule, donkey, cattle, swine, sheep, or goat. Specific rules for motor vehicle operators who come upon livestock being led on highways are stated as follows: 1. Drivers must use caution when approaching or passing people herding livestock; 2. Promptly stop if the livestock handler raises a hand as a distress signal (unless stopping would cause an accident) ; 3. Turn off their vehicle's engine if requested by the livestock handler; and 4. Yield the right of way to livestock on the highway. The Nebraska Department of Motor Vehicles (DMV) and the Nebraska State Patrol (NSP) have both indicated no fiscal impact. There is no basis to disagree with these estimates of no fiscal impact. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 496 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: State Patrol REVIEWED BY: Jacob Leaver DATE: 2/4/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4173 COMMENTS: Concur with the State Patrol’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 496. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 496 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Motor Vehicles REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 1/28/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Motor Vehicles assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 496. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES ST ATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 496 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: : Nebraska Department of Transportation REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 2/21/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: Nebraska Department of Transportation’s assessment of no net fiscal impact from LB 496 appears reasonable. Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 496 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Department of Motor Vehicles Prepared by: (3) Bart Moore Date Prepared: (4) January 23, 2025 Phone: (5) 402-471-3902 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: No Fiscal Impact _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR O BJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 496 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska State Patrol Prepared by: (3) Carol Aversman Date Prepared: (4) 01/29/2025 Phone: (5) 402-471-4545 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: NO FISCAL IMPACT _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 496 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska Department of Transportation Prepared by: (3) Jenessa Boynton Date Prepared: (4) 2/19/2025 Phone: (5) 402-479-4691 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: LB496 proposes for additional measures to be taken by motorist when approaching or passing any per son leading or herding livestock on the highway. In addition, the bill would require a motorist to promptly stop the motor vehicle if a distressed signal of raising a hand is provided by the person leading the livestock or turn off the motor vehicle at requested of the person leading the livestock. No fiscal impact is anticipated to the Department . _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………… ……... TOTAL……………………………… .....