Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB506 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/19/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Eric Kasik  
LB 506 DATE PREPARED: February 18, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0053 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 506 adopts the Landlord and Tenant Radon Awareness Act.  The Act allows for a tenant to request records 	of radon levels in the 
dwelling unit.  It allows for a 	tenant to conduct r adon testing and provide those test results to the landlord.  It outlines ways the tenant 
may terminate the lease without penalty with a concerning radon test.  It outlines how a tenant may pay for mitigation of r	adon; diverting 
money from rent equally over the term of the lease. It outlines responsibilities and disclosures required of a landlord 	under the act.   
 
No Fiscal Impact.    
 
  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONS E   
LB: 506        AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/14/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimated minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 506.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 506             AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Secretary of State 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/5/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Secretary of State’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 506.    
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 506 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Secretary of State 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Joan Arnold 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1-29-2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-2384 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No Fiscal Impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPEND	ITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 506 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/13/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDIT	URE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....