Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB518 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/04/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 518 DATE PREPARED: February 05, 2025 
PHONE: 	471-0050  
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 518 addresses parole policies and reporting requirements related to individuals incarcerated under the Nebraska Department of 
Correctional Services (NDCS).  
 
No fiscal impact.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 518                     AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Board of Parole 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                          DATE:    1/29/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Board of Parole’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 518.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POL T. SUB. 
RESPONSE 
   
LB: 518              AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Correctional Services 
   
REVIEWED BY:     Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   2/5/2025                               PHONE: (402) 
471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Correctional Services’ estimate of no fiscal impact as a result 
of LB 518.  
   
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 518 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Board of Parole 
 
Prepared by: 
(3)  Rosalyn Cotton, 
Chairperson 
Date Prepared: 
(4)
 January 27, 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402 479-5731 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 518 - No significant impact on budget related to LB 518.   
                  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 518 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Department of Correctional Services 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Lisa Stanton 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 01/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 (402)479-5702 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
NDCS estimates no fiscal impact as a result of LB518. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....