PREPARED BY: Shelly Glaser LB 530 DATE PREPARED: February 26, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0052 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB530 updates provisions related to motor vehicle homicide, including motor vehicle homicide where an unborn child is killed or a vulnerable road user. This bill creates a new definition for vulnerable road users , to be identified as: pedestrians, bicyclists, motorcyclists, utility workers, emergency services personnel, road construction workers, or someone operating farm equipment, and individuals in crosswalks or on the shoulder using a wheelchair or on a skateboard, etc. Ad ditionally, LB530 changes various penalties and fines for certain traffic violations, creates new felony classifications, and allows for more flexibility in the sentencing of suspending drivers’ licenses. The Nebraska Supreme Court has indicated a minimal fiscal impact for judicial education, which can be covered with their current appropriation. The Nebraska Department of Motor Vehicles, the Nebraska Department of Transportation, the Nebraska State Patrol, and the Lincoln Police Department have all indicated no fiscal impact. There is no basis to disagree with the estimations. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 530 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: 05 Supreme Court REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 2/25/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the 05 Supreme Court’s assessment of minimal fiscal impact from LB 530. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 530 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Motor Vehicles REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 1/28/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Motor Vehicles assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 530. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 530 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Department of Transportation REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 2/26/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: Concur with the Nebraska Department of Transportation assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 530. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 530 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska State Patrol REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 2/12/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska State Patrol’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 530 ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 530 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Lincoln Police Department REVIEWED BY: Joe Massey DATE: 1/30/2025 PHONE: (402) 471-4181 COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Lincoln Police Department assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 530. Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 530 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Department of Motor Vehicles Prepared by: (3) Bart Moore Date Prepared: (4) January 24, 2025 Phone: (5) 402-471-3902 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: No Fiscal Impact _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR O BJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 530 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska State Patrol Prepared by: (3) Carol Aversman Date Prepared: (4) 01/30/2025 Phone: (5) 402-471-4545 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: No Fiscal Impact. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 530 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Nebraska Department of Transportation Prepared by: (3) Jenessa Boynton Date Prepared: (4) 2/24/2025 Phone: (5) 402-479-4691 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: LB530 proposes changes to provisions for motor vehicle homicide and vulnerable road user. In addition, if enacted, fines for a person who operates a v ehicle in excess of the established speed limit on any highway or freeway would be increased. No fiscal impact is anticipated to the D epartment. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………… ……... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 530 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Lincoln Police Department Prepared by: (3) Captain Todd Kocian #940 Date Prepared: (4) 01-29-2025 Phone: (5) 402-441-1871 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: This bill changes penalties and fines for various traffic violations. As there appears to be no change in procedure, there would be no fiscal impact to our agency. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 530 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) 05 Supreme Court Prepared by: (3) Eric Asboe Date Prepared: (4) 2/23/2025 Phone: (5) 402-326-9215 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS Explanation of Estimate: Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial education. No additional resources required. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES Benefits………………………………...…… Operating…………………………...………. Travel……………………………………….. Capital outlay…………………...………….. Aid…………………………………………... Capital improvements………… …………... TOTAL……………………………… .....