Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB533 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/28/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Nikki Swope 
LB 533 DATE PREPARED: February 04, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0042 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 533 expands the Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and 	Regulation Act to provide additional provisions relating to clinician-
administered drugs, specialty pharmacie s and pharmacy benefit managers. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 533                 AM:                           AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Insurance 
REVIEWED BY:  Ryan Walton                DATE: 1/28/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: The Department of Insurance’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 533, appears reasonable. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDG ET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 533                 AM:                           AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Administrative Services (DAS) 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                DATE: 2/3/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-	4174 
COMMENTS: DAS’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 533, appears reasonable. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 533 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Administrative Services (DAS) –  
Employee Wellness & Benefits 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jennifer Sommars-Link Date Prepared: 
(4)
 01/28/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-1405 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
REVOLVING 
FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 533 would place requirements on a specialty pharmacy.  A pharmacy benefit manager or health carrier that 
requires dispensing of a clinician-administered drug through a specialty pharmacy is to establish and disclose a 
process which allows the health care provider or pharmacy to appeal and have exceptions to the use of a specialist 
pharmacy as provided in the bill.   
 
Further, it provides that a pharmacy benefit manager or health carrier shall not require a specialty pharmacy to 
dispense a clinician-administered drug directly to a covered person with the intent that the covered person will 
transport such drug to a health care provider for administration.   
 
LB 533 has no fiscal impact to the Department of Administrative Services.   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 533 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Department of Insurance 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Jordan Blades Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/24/24 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-4638 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
The Department does not anticipate any fiscal impact at this time.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  0533Provide requirements relating to clinician-administered drugs under the
Pharmacy Benefit Manager Licensure and Regulation Act
__________________________________
EXPENDITURESEXPENDITURES
NUMBER OF POSITIONS
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines.	2025
LB 
(1)
FISCAL NOTE
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name:
(2)
University of Nebraska System
Prepared by:
(3)
Anne Barnes	Date Prepared:
(4)
02/04/2025	Phone:
(5)
(402) 559-6300
ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION
FY 2025 - 26	FY 2026 - 27
EXPENDITURES REVENUE
GENERAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
CASH FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
FEDERAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
OTHER FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
TOTAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
EXPENDITURES	REVENUE
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
Explanation of Estimate:
No Fiscal Impact
The bill may require changes to business practices managed by our prescription drug benefit manager, but we anticipate these changes can be
made with little or no fiscal impact to the University of Nebraska.
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE
Personal Services:
POSITION TITLE
Benefits..............................................
Operating...........................................
Travel.................................................
Capital outlay....................................
Aid...................................................
Capital improvements........................
    TOTAL......................................
25 - 26
 0 
 0 
26 - 27
 0 
 0 
2025 - 26 2026 - 27