Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB560 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/12/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Eric Kasik  
LB 560 DATE PREPARED: February 06, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0053 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political su	bdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB560 amends statute in regards to innovative tourism grants currently awarded by the Tourism Commission.  I	t prioritizes cities or 
villages with a creative district and authorizes up to $500,000 per year for such grants.   
 
The bill changes distribution of grant funds, but requires no additional appropriation.   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  560             AM:                                  AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Tourism Commission 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                     DATE:  1/30/2025                                        	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: Disagree with Tourism Commission’s assessment of fiscal impact from LB 560. Revenue for the innovated 
grants from the agency is generated from Lodging Tax revenue the agency collects. The bill prioritizes and awards up to 
$500,000 of the innovate grants to a city of village 	with a creative district as described in 82-312. This would not be 
considered an additional expenditure for the agency, but more of an earmark on where the grant money goes. 
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB: 560                 AM:                           AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Arts Council 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Walton                DATE: 1/31/2025                                         	PHONE: (402) 471-4174 
COMMENTS: The Arts Council’s assessment of no fiscal impact from LB 560, appears reasonable. 
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 560 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Arts Council 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Mike Markey 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/28/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-595-3941 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
          
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
LB 560 has no fiscal impact on the Arts Coun	cil. 
The administration of the g	rants affected by the bill are administered by the Tourism C	ommission, therefore the 
bill would have no effect on our operations. 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26              26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....    
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 560 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Tourism Commission 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) John Ricks 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/28/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-480-5566 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
500,000  0  500,000  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
LB 560 amends statute regarding innovative tourism grants distributed by the Tourism Commission and 
prioritizes creative districts, allowing up to $500,000 in grants per year. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements………… …………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....