PREPARED BY: Clinton Verner LB 622 DATE PREPARED: February 20, 2025 PHONE: 402-471-0056 Revision: 00 FISCAL NOTE LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES (See narrative for political subdivision estimates) FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS $3,023,000 $3,023,000 $4,799,000 $4,799,000 FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS $3,023,000 $3,023,000 $4,799,000 $4,799,000 Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. LB622 would make the following amendments to the the Affordable Housing Trust Fund (AHTF): - Creates a new program, the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (SHAP); - Expands the AHTF to allow for down payment assistance under SHAP; - Allows for individuals to receive loans from the AHTF under SHAP; - Expands AHTF to allow homebuyers to receive assistance; and - Gives priority under AHTF to allocating trust fund assistance to homebuyers in enter prise zones or opportunity zones or in areas declared extremely blighted . LB622 creates a new program , SHAP, for providing down payment assistance for homebuyers. LB622 would allow the Department of Economic Development (DED) to promulgate rules and regulations concerning eligibi lity for homebuyers under SHAP, defines down payment assistance and caps the assistance to $30,000 per homebuyer. LB622 raises the Documentary Stamp Tax from $2.25 to $2.55 and credits the difference to the AHTF. Estimates for re venue and administrative cost provided by the Department of Economic Development appears reasonable. Revenue related to recoupment o f the loans is not included on this fiscal note as the timing and amounts are unknown and would likely occur outside of this biennium. LB622 does not prescribe the amount allocated to SHAP, for the purposes of this f iscal note it is presumed the new revenue is dedicated to SHAP. ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVIS ION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE LB: 468 AM: AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Economic Development REVIEWED BY: Ryan Yang DATE: 2/1/2025 PHONE: (402) 471- 4178 COMMENTS: The Department of Economic Development assessment of fiscal impact from LB 468 appears reasonable. Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 2025 LB (1) 622 FISCAL NOTE State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: (2) Department of Economic Development Prepared by: (3) Dave Dearmont Date Prepared: (4) 1/27/2025 Phone: (5) (402) 471-3777 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION FY 2025-26 FY 2026-27 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE GENERAL FUNDS CASH FUNDS $3,292,000 $3,292,000 $4,735,000 $4,735,000 FEDERAL FUNDS OTHER FUNDS TOTAL FUNDS $3,292,000 $3,292,000 $4,735,000 $4,735,000 Explanation of Estimate: LB622 would create the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (SHAP), administered by a nonprofit organization under a contract from DED. The bill would amend section 58-706 to make downpayment assistance under SHAP, an eligible for assistance under the Affordable Housing Trust Fund (AHTF), and Section 58-707 would be amended to allow individuals to receive direct loans form the AHTF pursuant to the SHAP. Qualifying homebuyers would be eligible for a loan of up to $30,000 to assist with the down payment on the homebuyer’s primary residence. Loans under the program would be repaid upon transfer of title of the home and will be subject to a lien for the amount of assistance. Under SHAP, the first priority in allocating assistance among homebuyers is to homebuyers that have the lowest incomes and are located in enterprise or opportunity zones, and in areas that have been declared extremely blighted. LB622 would also increase the Documentary Stamp Tax from $2.25 per $1,000 of value to $2.55, with the increased $0.30 credited to the AHTF. The bill does not specify how much of the AHTF should be dedicated to the SHAP. It is estimated that the increase in the distribution to the AHTF would result in approximately $3.292 million and $4.735 million in FY2025-26 and FY2026-27, respectively. Costs to implement the provisions of LB622 include an Economic Development Manager to oversee the program and the contractor’s work, and an IT Data/Database Analyst to manage the applications and data in the department’s grant management system. We estimate that the cost of the nonprofit contractor to administer the program would be $300,000 per year. Included in the operating costs are $300,000 for contracting with a nonprofit agency to administer the SHAP program, $1,710 for licenses for the department’s grant management software and $3,700 for additional office rent. _____________________________________________________________________________________________________ _ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE Personal Services: POSITION TITLE NUMBER OF POSITIONS 25-26 26-27 2025-26 EXPENDITURES 2026-27 EXPENDITURES G49550 Econ Dev Manager 0.75 1.0 $52,920 $70,560 A07051 IT Data/Database Analyst 0.25 0.25 18,460 18,460 Benefits………………………………...…… 24,990 31,160 Operating…………………………...………. 427,890 459,470 Travel……………………………………….. 7,140 9,350 Capital outlay…………………...………….. 8,600 0 Aid…………………………………………... 2,257,000 4,146,000 Capital improvements……………………... TOTAL……………………………… ..... $3,292,000 $4,735,000 LB 622 Fiscal Note 2025 State Agency Estimate State Agency Name: Department of Revenue Date Due LFO: Approved by: James R. Kamm Date Prepared: 02/18/2025 Phone: 471-5896 FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue General Funds Cash Funds $2,754,000 $4,863,000 $5,009,000 Federal Funds Other Funds Total Funds $2,754,000 $4,863,000 $5,009,000 Major Objects of Expenditure 25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 Class Code Classification Title FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures Benefits…………………………………………………………………………………………………………. Operating Costs…………………………………………………………………………………………………. Travel…………………………………………………………………………………………………………… Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………... Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………... Total……………………………………………………………………………………………………………. LB 622 creates the Statewide Housing Assistance Program (Program). The Program will be administered by a nonprofit corporation contracted by the Department of Economic Development. The purpose of the Program is to provide downpayment assistance loans towards the purchase of a new home. LB 622 raises the documentary stamp tax from $2.25 to $2.55 cents with the additional 0.30 cents to be deposited into the Affordable Housing Trust Fund to help fund the Program. It is estimated that increasing Documentary Stamp Tax under L B 622 will have the following impact: Fiscal Year Affordable Housing Trust Fund FY25-26 $ 2,754,000 FY26-27 $ 4,863,000 FY27-28 $ 5,009,000 FY28-29 $ 5,160,000 It is estimated that there will be minimal Costs to the Department of Revenue to implement this bill. The operative date for this bill is October 1, 2025.