Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB627 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/24/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Suzanne Houlden 
LB 627 DATE PREPARED: February 20, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0057 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS See below  See below  
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state ag	encies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 627, if passed, would direct the 	University of Nebraska (NU) Board of Regents to oversee the design, construction, and financing of 
student residential facilities for nursing and allied health students in Norfolk, NE. The bill outlines a twenty	-year state funding 
commitment of $1,150,000 annually, allowing for long-term financing agreements.  
 
The total FY26-FY27 biennium cost would be $2,300,000. Of the $1,150,000 annual appropriation, $250,000 would be allocated for 
educational technology, intended to support instructional resources at the Norfolk facilities. The total cost over the twenty-year period 
would be $23,000,000. The Board of Regents would be res	ponsible for contract approvals, payment structuring, and ensuring 
compliance with the bill’s financial provisions.  
 
Technical note: historically, residential facilities for NU and the State College system have been funded through st	udent housing fees. 
The University notes that it would not experience 	changes in revenue as a result of this bill, meaning that student fees would not be 
collected or applied for construction of the proposed Norfolk facilities.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STAT E BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE  
LB: 627                  AM:                      GENCY/POLT. SUB: Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education 
 
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns           DATE:  02/07/2025                              	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
 
COMMENTS:  Concur with the Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education’s assessment of no fiscal impact 
to the agency from LB 627. 
 
  
  0627Provide for a capital construction project for the University of Nebraska
__________________________________
EXPENDITURESEXPENDITURES
NUMBER OF POSITIONS
Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines.	2025
LB 
(1)
FISCAL NOTE
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name:
(2)
University of Nebraska System
Prepared by:
(3)
Anne Barnes	Date Prepared:
(4)
02/03/2025	Phone:
(5)
(402) 559-6300
ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION
FY 2025 - 26	FY 2026 - 27
EXPENDITURES REVENUE
GENERAL FUNDS
   1,150,000.00           0.00 
CASH FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
FEDERAL FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
OTHER FUNDS
           0.00           0.00 
TOTAL FUNDS
   1,150,000.00           0.00 
EXPENDITURES	REVENUE
   1,150,000.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
           0.00           0.00 
   1,150,000.00           0.00 
Explanation of Estimate:
If LB627 were to pass, it would direct the Board of Regents to oversee the design, construction, and financing of student residential facilities for
nursing and allied health students in Norfolk.
The bill outlines a 20-year state funding commitment of $1,150,000 annually, allowing for long-term financing agreements. The Board of Regents
would be responsible for contract approvals, payment structuring, and ensuring compliance with the bill#s financial provisions. The University would
manage these financial arrangements within the appropriated funding structure, with ownership of the facilities reverting to the University upon
completion of all obligations. Additionally, the bill allocates $250,000 for educational technology, intended to support instructional resources at the
Norfolk facilities.
The University would not experience changes in revenue as a result of this bill. The fiscal impact is limited to state-funded capital expenditures, with
no anticipated ongoing personnel or operational costs beyond construction and financing administration.
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE
Personal Services:
POSITION TITLE
Benefits..............................................
Operating...........................................
Travel.................................................
Capital outlay....................................
Aid...................................................
Capital improvements........................
    TOTAL......................................
25 - 26
 0 
 0 
26 - 27
 0 
 0 
2025 - 26
1,150,000.00
1,150,000.00
2026 - 27
1,150,000.00
1,150,000.00 Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 627 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Gary Timm 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/27/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402.471.0020 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
No fiscal impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements………… …………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....