Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB643 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/25/2025

                    PREPARED BY: John Wiemer 
LB 643 DATE PREPARED: March 25, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0051 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 	$57,123 $2,260,000  $5,200,000 
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS 	$57,123 $2,260,000  $5,200,000 
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 643 provides that for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, any person who owns directly or indirectly more than 30 
parcels of single-family residential property as defined in section 77-3505.04 as in	vestment or rental property shall not claim any 
deductions from Nebraska income taxes relating to any interest or taxes paid on or any maintenance of such property. The bill specifies 
when this shall not apply. 
 
A person may appeal to the Department of Revenue (DOR) that the single-family residential property of such person was offered for 
sale at a fair market rate for at least 90 days and there were no good faith offers on such property. If such appeal is successful, such 
person may claim deductions from Nebraska income taxes relating to any interest or taxes paid on or any maintenance of such 
property. 
 
The DOR estimates the following increases to General Fund revenues as a result of the bill:   
• FY26: $2,260,000 
• FY27: $5,200,000 
• FY28: $4,690,000 
• FY29: $4,470,000 
 
The DOR also estimates a one-time programming charge of $57,123 to be paid to the Office of the Chief 	Information Officer (OCIO) as 
a result of the bill. 
 
There is no basis to disagree with these estimates by the DOR. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
LB:  643           AM:                                  AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Revenue 
REVIEWED BY:  	Ryan Yang                     DATE: 3/21/2025                                         PHONE: (402) 471-4178 
COMMENTS: The Department of Revenue assessments of General Fund revenue impact and impact to the agency 
from LB 643 appear reasonable. 
  
  LB 0643 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 	State Agency Estimate  
State Agency Name: Department of Revenue  	Date Due LFO: 
Approved by: James R. Kamm 	Date Prepared: 03/21/2025 	Phone: 471-5896  
 	FY 2025-2026 FY 2026-2027 FY 2027-2028 
 	Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue Expenditures Revenue 
General Funds 	$ 57,123 $ 2,260,000  $ 0 $ 5,200,000  $ 0 $ 4,690,000 
Cash Funds         
Federal Funds         
Other Funds         
Total Funds 	$ 57,123 $ 2,260,000  $ 0 $ 5,200,000  $ 0 $ 4,690,000 
    
 
 	Major Objects of Expenditure  
  	25-26 26-27 27-28 25-26 26-27 27-28 
Class Code 	Classification Title 	FTE FTE FTE Expenditures Expenditures Expenditures 
      
      
      
      
      
Benefits………………………………………………………………………………………………………….    
Operating Costs…………………………………………………………………………………………………. $57,123 $ 0 $ 0 
Travel……………………………………………………………………………………………………………    
Capital Outlay…………………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Capital Improvements…………………………………………………………………………………………...    
Total……………………………………………………………………………………………………………. $57,123 $ 0 $ 0 
 
LB 643 provides that, for taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2026, any person who owns directly or 
indirectly more than 30 parcels of single-family residential property, as defined in Neb. Rev. Stat. § 77	-3505.04 
as investment or rental property, will not claim any deductions from Nebraska income tax relating to any interest 
or taxes paid on or any maintenance of such property. This section does not apply to any:  
• Property of a person used as principal residence of such person 
• Property of a qualified nonprofit organization (as defined by LB 643); or  
• Person who sold at least:  
o Ten percent of the single-family residential property that was owned by such a person on January 
1 of any calendar year and such property was sold during such year to buyers who will reside at 
such property; or  
o Five percent of the single-family residential property that was owned by such person on January 1 
of any calendar year and such properties were sold during such year to first-time homebuyers as 
defined in § 58 -211.01. 
 
A person may appeal to the Department of Revenue (DOR) that the single-family residential property of such 
person was offered for sale at a fair market rate for at least 90 days and there were no good faith offers on such 
property. If such appeal is successful, such person may claim deductions from Nebraska income taxes relating to 
any interest or taxes paid on or any maintenance of such property.  
 
LB 643 defines a qualified nonprofit organization as any organization not organized for profit; and has a principal 
purpose of the creation, development, or preservation of affordable housing. The term includes many types of 
housing and community organizations authorized under federal law; land banks created under the Nebraska 
Municipal Land Bank Act; resident-owned cooperatives; community land trusts, as defined by LB 643; and 
projects that qualify under the Affordable Housing Tax Credit Act.  
 
The DOR estimates that LB 643 would impact the General Fund revenues as follows:  
 
 
  LB 0643 page 2 	Fiscal Note 2025 
 
Fiscal Year General Fund revenues 
FY25-26  $               2,260,000  
FY26-27  $               5,200,000  
FY27-28  $               4,690,000  
FY28-29  $               4,470,000  
 
LB 643 requires a one-time programming charge of $57,123 paid to the OCIO for mainframe development.  
 
It is estimated that there will be minimal costs to the Department to implement this bill.