Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB663 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/27/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Eric Kasik  
LB 663 DATE PREPARED: February 27, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0053 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 663 amends statute regarding county boards and commissions.   
 
• It sets an educational requirement of 2 hours per term for county commission and county board members.   
• It requires county officials to base decisions on conditional use permits solely on county zoning regulations 
• It disallows requiring federal, state or other local permit when deciding on conditional use 	permits 
• It sets a timeline for county commissions to follow when processing an application for conditional use permits: 
o 30 days to determine application is complete 
o 10 days to communicate an application is incomplete 
o 30 additional days after receiving 	information to complete the application 
o 90 days to grant or deny the conditional use permit or make a recommendation to the 	county board 
o If the conditional use permit requires a higher level of approval, the timeline starts over.   
 
This legislation will have a 	fiscal impact to counties. 
 
However, there is no fiscal impact to state government.   
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB:  663             AM:                         AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE: 1/24/2025                                          	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts assessment of no fiscal impact 
from LB 663 
   
  
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE 
   
LB: 663            AM:                                       AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Douglas County 
   
REVIEWED BY:  	Joe Massey                     DATE:  1/31/2025                                         	PHONE: (402) 471-4181 
   
COMMENTS: No basis to disagree with the Douglas County assessment of fiscal impact from LB 663    
  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB663
(1) 
Provide for required education for members of county planning commissions 
and county boards and change provisions relating to conditional use or special 
exception determinations by county planning commissions and county boards 
FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Douglas County 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Kent E. Holm 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 29 Jan 2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-444-3959 
 
                                           ESTIM	ATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
2133.82  0  2197.83  0 
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
0  0  0  0 
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
2133.82  0  2197.83  0 
 
 
Explanation of Estimate: 
Planning Commission members:  9 members serving staggered 3- year terms.  Provide at least one 2 hour 
training to 3 Commission members each year. 
County Board members:  7 members serving staggered 4-	year terms.  Provide at least one 2 hour training 
every other year to the members of the Board most recently elected. 
Training costs will depend on what gets developed, the format of the trai	ning, and how often the training 
materials are updated.  The assumption is that a pre-	recorded video format and/or virtual interactive training 
formats will be available to use.  For purposes of this estimate, the Planning and Zoning Coordinator and 
Planning and Zoning Assistant will each spend 4 hours each year preparing the Planning Commission member 
training and 4 hours each year preparing the County Board member training.  They each will spend up to 9 
hours each year on the presentation of the training to Planning Commission members and up to 12 hours each 
year on the presentation of the training to County Board members.  Assumed per hour costs for the Planning 
and Zoning Coordinator and Planning and Zoning Assistant are $36.60 and $20 .00, respectively.  A 3% 
increase is assumed for the 2026-	2027 expenditures. Benefits are calculated at 30% of the hourly wage. 
 
Operating expenses and travel expenses will be dependent on the training formats and cannot be calculated at 
this time. 
 
Requirements for reporting are not defined so costs for that are not included here. 
 
This is an unfunded mandate as no revenue to cover the additional expenses is provided. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJO	R OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
Planning and Zoning Coordinator 1 1 1061.4  1093.24 
Planning and Zoning Assistant 1 1 580  597.40 
Benefits………………………………...……   492.42  507.19  Operating…………………………...……….   TBD  TBD 
Travel………………………………………..   TBD  TBD 
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
     TOTAL……………………………… .....   2133.82  2197.83 
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 663 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska Auditor of Public Accounts 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Craig Kubicek Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-3063 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$0   $0  
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
 
No impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...……… …..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....