Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB669 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 03/05/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Mikayla Findlay 
LB 669 DATE PREPARED: February 11, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0062 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and politica	l subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
No fiscal impact. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 669                AM:                           	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:  3/3/2025                                 	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 669.    
  
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE   
LB: 669           AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Department of Health and Human Services 
   
REVIEWED BY:     	Jacob Leaver                           DATE:    2/10/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Department of Health and Human Services’ estimate of no fiscal impact as a result 
of LB 669. 
   
  
   
 
 
LB (1) 669 FISCAL NOTE 	2025 
 
 ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
State Agency or Political Subdivision Name:(2) Department of Health and Human Services 
Prepared by: (3) John Meals 	Date Prepared 2-10-25 	Phone: (5) 471-6719 
 	FY 2025-2026  	FY 2026-2027 
 	EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS      
CASH FUNDS      
FEDERAL FUNDS      
OTHER FUNDS      
TOTAL FUNDS 	$0 	$0  	$0 	$0 
 
 
Return by date specified or 72 hours prior to public hearing, whichever is earlier. 
Explanation of Estimate: 
 
There is no fiscal impact to the Department of Health and Human Services. 
 
MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
 
 
PERSONAL SERVICES: 
 	NUMBER OF POSITIONS 2025-2026 	2026-2027 
POSITION TITLE 	25-26 26-27 EXPENDITURES EXPENDITURES 
 
   
 
   
 
   
 
   
 
   
Benefits............................................................................................................................... 
  
Operating............................................................................................................................ 
  
Travel.................................................................................................................................. 
  
Capital Outlay..................................................................................................................... 
  
Aid...................................................................................................................................... 
  
Capital Improvements......................................................................................................... 
  
                   TOTAL............................................................................................................ 
$0 $0 
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 669 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/27/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial education. No additional resources required.  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....