Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB678 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 02/24/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Suzanne Houlden 
LB 678 DATE PREPARED: February 20, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0057 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS $2,910,962  $5,810,161  
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS $2,910,962  $5,810,161  
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached f ollowing the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 678 states intent to appropriate General Fund dollars to the Board of Trustees of the Nebraska State Colleges (NSCS) 	for salary 
increases, minimum wage increases, and for increases in health insurance premiums for the FY26-FY27 biennium . These dollar 
amounts, as broken out in the table below, were 	included in the NSCS FY26-27 operating budget request.  
 
As stated in the bill, the funding for salary increases is based on negotiated agreements with the Nebraska Association of P	ublic 
Employees (NAPE), the State College Education Association, and the Nebraska State College System Pr	ofessional Association. The 
negotiation process with bargai	ning units is completed before the state appropriation cycle begins. The 	amounts for minimum wage 
increases are based on the Wage and Hour Act changes that took place on January 1, 2025, and on change	s that will take effect 
January 1, 2026. The amounts for health insurance premiums were based on the budget instructions issued by the Department of 
Administrative Services (DAS) to assume a 5% increase each year of the upcoming biennium. The actual 	rate increase for NSC S, who 
uses a different provider than the 	State of Nebraska, will be 5.4% for FY6. The increase for health insurance that will be appropriated 
for some agencies will be 11% year over year.  
 
 
 	Biennium Request 
  	FY26 	FY27 
Employee Salary Increase 3.0% 	$2,199,416 $4,464,828 
Health Insurance 5.0% 	$488,790 $1,002,019 
Minimum Wage 	$222,756 	$343,314 
Total 	$2,910,962 $5,810,161 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE  
LB: 678                  AM:                     GENCY/POLT. SUB: Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education 
 
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberly Burns           DATE:  02/07/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
 
COMMENTS:  Concur with the Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education’s assessment of no fiscal impact 
to the agency from LB 678. 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. RESPONSE  
LB: 678                  AM:                          AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Nebraska State College System 
 
REVIEWED BY:  Kimberl	y Burns          DATE:  02/19/2025                               	PHONE: (402) 471-4171 
 
COMMENTS:  The Nebraska State College System’s FY 2025-26 estimate of fiscal impact from LB 678 appears 
reasonable. Disagree with the FY 2026-	27 fiscal impact estimate, which does not appear to compound the FY 2025-26 
increases into the impact shown for FY 2026-27. 
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 678 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Nebraska State College System 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Brenda Owen Date Prepared: 
(4)
 2/14/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-471-2505 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
$2,910,962    $2,899,199   
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
$2,910,962    $2,899,199   
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Employee Salary Increase: 
The salary increases in line with biennium budget instructions as requested by the Department of Administrative 
Services State Budget Division.  It includes the cost impact of a 3% salary increase on base salaries for the NSCS 
that was recommended by the Department of Administrative Services (DAS) which was the basis for 	the labor 
negotiations with the three unions across the State Colleges (NAPE /AFSCME, NSCPA, and SCEA) . 
 
Health Insurance: 
This request supports the health, dental and vision benefits programs for all benefit eligible employees.   The DAS 
budget instructions ask that a 5% increase be used for each year of the biennium.  While the NSCS uses a 
different provider than the State of Nebraska, the average increase for the last five years is 5% and the basis of the 
request. The rate increase for FY26 has been set at 5.4%, and FY27 rates will not be available until October 2025 
but are expected to align with the 5% average from the past five years.  
 
Minimum Wage: 
To address the minimum wage increase that occurred on January 1, 2025, with one-	half of the budget impact 
felt in FY25, and the full impact felt in FY26.  The FY25 impact was addressed with the recent tuition increase. 
The second half of the impact is included in the minimum wage request. The minimum wage will increase 
again on January 1, 2026 ($13.50 to $15.00), with one-	half of the impact included in the FY26 request and the 
second half in the FY27 request. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
   
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
Various  $2,422,172   $2,385,970  
   
Benefits………………………………...……   $488,790  $513,229 
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....   $2,910,962   $2,899,199  
  Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 678 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
Coordinating Commission for Postsecondary Education 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Gary Timm 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/23/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402.471.0020 
 
                                           ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
No fiscal impact 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……….    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....