Nebraska 2025 2025-2026 Regular Session

Nebraska Legislature Bill LB93 Introduced / Fiscal Note

Filed 01/22/2025

                    PREPARED BY: Kenneth Boggs 
LB 93 DATE PREPARED: January 16, 2025 
PHONE: 	402-471-0050 
    
Revision: 00  
  FISCAL NOTE 
 	LEGISLATIVE FISCAL ANALYST ESTIMATE 
 
ESTIMATE OF FISCAL IMPACT – STATE AGENCIES 	(See narrative for political subdivision estimates) 
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS     
CASH FUNDS     
FEDERAL FUNDS     
OTHER FUNDS     
TOTAL FUNDS     
 
Any Fiscal Notes received from state agencies and political subdivisions are attached following the Legislative Fiscal Analyst Estimate. 
 
LB 93 introduces updates to Nebraska’s criminal procedure laws. It focuses on expanding discovery rights for defendants, including 
access to digital and electronic communication evidence, and requires full disclosure of expert witness opinions and their bases. The 
bill also emphasizes the continuing obligation to disclose newly discovered evidence before or during a trial.  
 
The Supreme Court would have a minimal fiscal impact .  
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. 
RESPONSE 
   
LB:   93               AM:                            	AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Supreme Court 
   
REVIEWED BY:     Jacob Leaver                           DATE:   1/22/2025                                PHONE: (402) 
471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Supreme Court’s estimate of minimal fiscal impact as a result of LB 93.   
 
ADMINISTRATIVE SERVICES STATE BUDGET DIVISION: REVIEW OF AGENCY & POLT. SUB. 
RESPONSE 
   
LB:    93                AM:                            AGENCY/POLT. SUB: Attorney General 
   
REVIEWED BY:     Jacob Leaver                           DATE: 1/15/2025                                  PHONE: (402) 
471-4173 
   
COMMENTS: Concur with the Attorney General’s estimate of no fiscal impact as a result of LB 93.   
 
   Please complete ALL (5) blanks in the first three lines. 	2025 
LB
(1) 93 	FISCAL NOTE 
 
State Agency OR Political Subdivision Name: 
(2) 
05 Supreme Court 
 
Prepared by: 
(3) Eric Asboe 	Date Prepared: 
(4)
 1/18/2025 Phone: 
(5)
 402-326-9215 
 
                                          ESTIMATE PROVIDED BY STATE AGENCY OR POLITICAL SUBDIVISION  
                                
 	FY 2025-26 	FY 2026-27 
 EXPENDITURES REVENUE EXPENDITURES REVENUE 
GENERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
CASH FUNDS 
 
    
 
FEDERAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
OTHER FUNDS 
 
    
 
TOTAL FUNDS 
 
    
 
 Explanation of Estimate: 
 
Minimal fiscal impact to provide judicial education. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
_____________________________________________________________________________________________________ 	_ 
BREAKDOWN BY MAJOR OBJECTS OF EXPENDITURE 
Personal Services:      
POSITION TITLE 
NUMBER OF POSITIONS 
25-26               26-27 
2025-26 
EXPENDITURES 
2026-27 
EXPENDITURES 
   
   
Benefits………………………………...……    
Operating…………………………...……… .    
Travel………………………………………..    
Capital outlay…………………...…………..    
Aid…………………………………………...    
Capital improvements……………………...    
      TOTAL……………………………… .....