Nevada 2023 2023 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB72 Amended / Bill

Filed 06/03/2023

                     	EXEMPT 
 (Reprinted with amendments adopted on June 3, 2023) 
 	SECOND REPRINT S.B. 72 
 
- 	*SB72	_R2	* 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 72–COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION 
 
(ON BEHALF OF THE JOINT INTERIM STANDING  
COMMITTEE ON EDUCATION) 
 
PREFILED JANUARY 23, 2023 
____________ 
 
Referred to Committee on Education 
 
SUMMARY—Directs the Joint Interim Standing Committee on 
Education to conduct certain studies during the 
2023-2024 interim. (BDR S-441) 
 
FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: No. 
 Effect on the State: Yes. 
 
~ 
 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
 
AN ACT relating to education; directing the Joint Interim Standing 
Committee on Education to conduct certain studies during 
the 2023-2024 interim and report its findings to the 
Legislature; and providing other matters properly relating 
thereto. 
Legislative Counsel’s Digest: 
 Existing law creates the Joint Interim Standing Committee on Education. (NRS 1 
218E.320) Existing law authorizes the Committee to: (1) evaluate, review and 2 
comment upon issues related to education in Nevada; (2) conduct investigations 3 
and hold hearings; (3) conduct studies as directed by the Legislature or the 4 
Legislative Commission; and (4) make certain recommendations to the Legislature. 5 
(NRS 218E.330, 218E.615) This bill directs the Committee to conduct six separate 6 
studies during the 2023-2024 interim and report its findings for each study to the 7 
Legislature. Specifically, this bill directs the Committee to study: (1) the mental 8 
health and wellness of pupils; (2) the workload of teachers, including any relevant 9 
statutory and regulatory requirements; (3) requirements governing the licensing and 10 
authorization to work of teachers and administrators and the effect of such 11 
requirements on the diversity and effectiveness of teachers and administrators and 12 
the recruitment of local teachers and administrators; (4) trends in graduation and 13 
achievement of pupils enrolled in high school and any divergence between those 14 
trends; (5) groups of pupils that may require additional resources, and policies and 15 
strategies that may address the needs of such groups; and (6) waivers of registration 16 
fees, laboratory fees and other fees at institutions within the Nevada System of 17 
Higher Education. 18 
   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- 	*SB72	_R2	* 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  1. The Joint Interim Standing Committee on 1 
Education shall, during the 2023-2024 interim: 2 
 (a) Conduct a study concerning the mental health and wellness 3 
of pupils in this State and programs to improve the mental health 4 
and wellness of such pupils, including, without limitation, evidence-5 
based mental health therapies and practices. 6 
 (b) Conduct a study concerning the workload of teachers in this 7 
State, including, without limitation, provisions of law and 8 
regulations that affect the workload of teachers in this State, to 9 
better understand and evaluate the workload of teachers in this State. 10 
 (c) Conduct a study concerning requirements governing the 11 
licensing and authorization to work of teachers and administrators in 12 
this State, including, without limitation, requirements for the 13 
authorization of a holder of a J-1 visa issued pursuant to 8 U.S.C. § 14 
1101(a)(15)(J) to work as a teacher or administrator, in order to: 15 
  (1) Identify whether such requirements are barriers to 16 
increasing the diversity of teachers or administrators, as applicable, 17 
in this State and increasing the number of pupils in the public 18 
schools in this State and students at institutions of higher education 19 
in this State who eventually become teachers and administrators in 20 
this State; and  21 
  (2) Ensure that requirements concerning the competency of 22 
applicants for a license as a teacher or administrator, as applicable, 23 
are reasonable indicators of the future effectiveness of such an 24 
applicant as a teacher or administrator. 25 
 (d) Conduct a study concerning: 26 
  (1) Trends in the graduation rates of, and the types of 27 
diplomas awarded to, pupils enrolled in high school in this State, 28 
based on the information included in the annual report of 29 
accountability pursuant to NRS 385A.260; 30 
  (2) Trends in achievement of pupils enrolled in high school 31 
in this State, including, without limitation, information relating to 32 
such trends that is included in the annual report of accountability 33 
pursuant to NRS 385A.200; 34 
  (3) A comparison of the trends described in subparagraphs 35 
(1) and (2); and 36 
  (4) Any factors which may be responsible for the trends 37 
described in subparagraphs (1) and (2) and any divergence between 38 
the trends described in subparagraph (1) and the trends described in 39 
subparagraph (2). 40 
 (e) Conduct a study concerning: 41   
 	– 3 – 
 
 
- 	*SB72	_R2	* 
  (1) Groups of pupils who may require additional resources to 1 
receive a reasonably equal educational opportunity; 2 
  (2) The specific educational needs of such groups of pupils; 3 
  (3) Policies and strategies that target such groups of pupils, 4 
address specific needs and provide specific interventions, including, 5 
without limitation, policies and strategies to increase enrollment in 6 
postsecondary education or vocational training; and 7 
  (4) Long-term strategies to fund and implement such policies 8 
and programs. 9 
 (f) Conduct a study concerning waivers of registration fees, 10 
laboratory fees and other fees at institutions within the Nevada 11 
System of Higher Education, including, without limitation, any such 12 
waivers granted by the Board of Regents of the University of 13 
Nevada pursuant to NRS 396.544 to 396.54495, inclusive. 14 
 2. On or before February 1, 2025, for each study listed in 15 
subsection 1, the Joint Interim Standing Committee on Education 16 
shall submit a report of its findings and any recommendations for 17 
legislation to the Director of the Legislative Counsel Bureau for 18 
transmittal to the 83rd Session of the Legislature. 19 
 Sec. 2.  This act becomes effective on July 1, 2023. 20 
 
H