Nevada 2023 2023 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB99 Introduced / Bill

                      
  
  	S.B. 99 
 
- 	*SB99* 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 99–SENATOR GOICOECHEA 
 
PREFILED FEBRUARY 2, 2023 
____________ 
 
Referred to Committee on Finance 
 
SUMMARY—Makes an appropriation to the Desert Research 
Institute of the Nevada System of Higher Education 
to support the Nevada State Cloud Seeding Program. 
(BDR S-592) 
 
FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: No. 
 Effect on the State: Contains Appropriation not included 
in Executive Budget. 
 
~ 
 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
 
AN ACT making an appropriation to the Desert Research Institute 
of the Nevada System of Higher Education to support the 
Nevada State Cloud Seeding Program; and providing 
other matters properly relating thereto. 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  1. There is hereby appropriated from the State 1 
General Fund to the Desert Research Institute of the Nevada System 2 
of Higher Education to support the Nevada State Cloud Seeding 3 
Program administered by the Desert Research Institute the following 4 
sums: 5 
For the Fiscal Year 2023-2024 .................................. $600,000 6 
For the Fiscal Year 2024-2025 .................................. $600,000 7 
 2.  The Desert Research Institute shall: 8 
 (a) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 9 
Committee on or before September 1, 2024, that describes each 10 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 11 
from the date on which the money was received by the Desert 12 
Research Institute through June 30, 2024; and 13 
 (b) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 14 
Committee on or before September 1, 2025, that describes each 15 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 16   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- 	*SB99* 
from the date on which the money was received by the Desert 1 
Research Institute through June 30, 2025. 2 
 Sec. 2.  Any balance of the sums appropriated by section 1 of 3 
this act remaining at the end of the respective fiscal years must not 4 
be committed for expenditure after June 30 of the respective fiscal 5 
years by the entity to which the appropriation is made or any entity 6 
to which money from the appropriation is granted or otherwise 7 
transferred in any manner, and any portion of the appropriated 8 
money remaining must not be spent for any purpose after  9 
September 20, 2024, and September 19, 2025, respectively, by 10 
either the entity to which the money was appropriated or the entity 11 
to which the money was subsequently granted or transferred, and 12 
must be reverted to the State General Fund on or before  13 
September 20, 2024, and September 19, 2025, respectively. 14 
 Sec. 3.  This act becomes effective on July 1, 2023. 15 
 
H