Nevada 2025 2025 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB145 Introduced / Bill

                      
  
  	S.B. 145 
 
- 	*SB145* 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 145–SENATOR TAYLOR 
 
PREFILED JANUARY 30, 2025 
____________ 
 
Referred to Committee on Finance 
 
SUMMARY—Makes a contingent appropriation for the restoration 
and refurbishment of the Lear Theater in Reno, 
Nevada. (BDR S-765) 
 
FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: May have Fiscal Impact. 
 Effect on the State: Contains Appropriation not included 
in Executive Budget. 
 
~ 
 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
 
AN ACT making a contingent appropriation for allocation to the 
City of Reno for the restoration and refurbishment of the 
Lear Theater in Reno, Nevada; and providing other 
matters properly relating thereto. 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  1. There is hereby appropriated from the State 1 
General Fund to the Interim Finance Committee the sum of 2 
$12,500,000 for allocation to the City of Reno for the restoration 3 
and refurbishment of the Lear Theater in Reno, Nevada, including, 4 
without limitation, any necessary repairs to meet the requirements of 5 
any applicable building, fire, health and safety codes. 6 
 2. Allocation of the money appropriated by subsection 1 is 7 
contingent upon matching money being obtained by the City of 8 
Reno, including, without limitation, gifts, grants and donations to 9 
the City of Reno from private and public sources of money other 10 
than the appropriation made by subsection 1. The Interim Finance 11 
Committee shall not direct the transfer of any portion of money 12 
from the appropriation made by subsection 1 until the City Manager 13 
of the City of Reno submits to the Committee proof satisfactory to 14 
the Committee that matching money in an equivalent amount has 15 
been committed. 16   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- 	*SB145* 
 3.  Upon acceptance of the money appropriated by subsection 1, 1 
the City Manager of the City of Reno agrees to: 2 
 (a) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 3 
Committee on or before December 18, 2026, that describes each 4 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 5 
from the date on which the money was received by the City of Reno 6 
through December 1, 2026; 7 
 (b) Prepare and transmit a final report to the Interim Finance 8 
Committee on or before September 17, 2027, that describes each 9 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 10 
from the date on which the money was received by the City of Reno 11 
through June 30, 2027; and 12 
 (c) Upon request of the Legislative Commission, make available 13 
to the Legislative Auditor any of the books, accounts, claims, 14 
reports, vouchers or other records of information, confidential or 15 
otherwise, of the City of Reno, regardless of their form or location, 16 
that the Legislative Auditor deems necessary to conduct an audit of 17 
the use of the money appropriated by subsection 1. 18 
 4. Any remaining balance of the appropriation made by 19 
subsection 1 must not be committed for expenditure after June 30, 20 
2027, by the entity to which the appropriation is made or any entity 21 
to which money from the appropriation is granted or otherwise 22 
transferred in any manner, and any portion of the appropriated 23 
money remaining must not be spent for any purpose after  24 
September 17, 2027, by either the entity to which the money was 25 
appropriated or the entity to which the money was subsequently 26 
granted or transferred, and must be reverted to the State General 27 
Fund on or before September 17, 2027. 28 
 Sec. 2.  This act becomes effective upon passage and approval. 29 
 
H