Nevada 2025 2025 Regular Session

Nevada Senate Bill SB178 Introduced / Bill

                      
  
  	S.B. 178 
 
- 	*SB178* 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 178–SENATOR DOÑATE 
 
PREFILED FEBRUARY 3, 2025 
____________ 
 
Referred to Committee on Finance 
 
SUMMARY—Makes a contingent appropriation for allocation to 
Mondays Dark, Inc. for building a certain facility. 
(BDR S-708) 
 
FISCAL NOTE: Effect on Local Government: No. 
 Effect on the State: Contains Appropriation not included 
in Executive Budget. 
 
~ 
 
EXPLANATION – Matter in bolded italics is new; matter between brackets [omitted material] is material to be omitted. 
 
 
AN ACT making a contingent appropriation for allocation to 
Mondays Dark, Inc. for the building of a facility in the 
Las Vegas, Nevada, area to provide space for the 
provision of educational, mental health and other services 
to the community; and providing other matters properly 
relating thereto. 
THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF NEVADA, REPRESENTED IN 
SENATE AND ASSEMBLY, DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: 
 
 Section 1.  1. There is hereby appropriated from the State 1 
General Fund to the Interim Finance Committee the sum of 2 
$5,000,000 for allocation to Mondays Dark, Inc. for the building of 3 
a facility in the Las Vegas, Nevada, area to provide space for the 4 
provision of educational, mental health and other services to the 5 
community. 6 
 2.  Allocation of the money appropriated by subsection 1 is 7 
contingent upon matching money being obtained by Mondays Dark, 8 
Inc., including, without limitation, gifts, grants and donations to 9 
Mondays Dark, Inc. from private and public sources of money other 10 
than the appropriation made by subsection 1, for the building of 11 
such a facility. The Interim Finance Committee shall not direct the 12 
transfer of any portion of the money appropriated by subsection 1 13 
until Mondays Dark, Inc. submits to the Committee proof 14   
 	– 2 – 
 
 
- 	*SB178* 
satisfactory that matching money in an equivalent amount has been 1 
committed. 2 
 3. Upon acceptance of the money appropriated by subsection 1, 3 
Mondays Dark, Inc. agrees to: 4 
 (a) Prepare and transmit a report to the Interim Finance 5 
Committee on or before December 18, 2026, that describes each 6 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 7 
from the date on which the money was received by Mondays Dark, 8 
Inc. through December 1, 2026; 9 
 (b) Prepare and transmit a final report to the Interim Finance 10 
Committee on or before September 17, 2027, that describes each 11 
expenditure made from the money appropriated by subsection 1 12 
from the date on which the money was received by Mondays Dark, 13 
Inc. through June 30, 2027; and 14 
 (c) Upon request of the Legislative Commission, make available 15 
to the Legislative Auditor any of the books, accounts, claims, 16 
reports, vouchers or other records of information, confidential or 17 
otherwise, of Mondays Dark, Inc., regardless of their form or 18 
location, that the Legislative Auditor deems necessary to conduct an 19 
audit of the use of the money appropriated by subsection 1. 20 
 4. Any remaining balance of the appropriation made by 21 
subsection 1 must not be committed for expenditure after June 30, 22 
2027, by the entity to which the appropriation is made or any entity 23 
to which money from the appropriation is granted or otherwise 24 
transferred in any manner, and any portion of the appropriated 25 
money remaining must not be spent for any purpose after  26 
September 17, 2027, by either the entity to which the money was 27 
appropriated or the entity to which the money was subsequently 28 
granted or transferred, and must be reverted to the State General 29 
Fund on or before September 17, 2027. 30 
 Sec. 2.  This act becomes effective upon passage and approval. 31 
 
H