New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02576

Introduced
5/23/24  
Refer
5/23/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Congratulating Madison Tuttle upon the occasion of capturing the 2024 Adidas Indoor Nationals Track and Field Championship in the 1-mile racewalk
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02578

Introduced
5/23/24  
Refer
5/23/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Commemorating the 120th Anniversary of St. Elizabeth College of Nursing
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02577

Introduced
5/23/24  
Refer
5/23/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Congratulating The Reverend John Buehler upon the occasion of celebrating the 50th Anniversary of his Ordination to the Priesthood
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02589

Introduced
5/24/24  
Refer
5/24/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Commending the Ancient Egyptian Arabic Order Nobles Mystic Shrine upon the occasion of celebrating Jubilee Day on June 2, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02587

Introduced
5/24/24  
Commemorating the 175th Anniversary of Pfizer, Inc., and recognizing the company's service to the citizens of the State of New York and the World
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02590

Introduced
5/24/24  
Refer
5/24/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Commending the Brooklyn Academy of Music upon the occasion of hosting the 2024 DanceAfrica Festival to be celebrated May 24-27, 2024, and paying tribute to this year's Opening Night Honoree, Ms. Amma D. McKen
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02593

Introduced
5/28/24  
Refer
5/28/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Congratulating Christopher Cardello, owner and founder of Subaru of Utica, upon the occasion of his retirement after 35 years of distinguished service
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02586

Introduced
5/24/24  
Refer
5/24/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Honoring influential Black authors upon the occasion of special recognition at the Black Authors Festival in Sag Harbor, New York on August 3, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02588

Introduced
5/24/24  
Congratulating Marilyn Dyer for 40 years of dedicated service to the New York State Senate
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02359

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring First Sergeant Christopher E. Williams upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of the George M. Searle Memorial Award by the New York State Police Department on May 16, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02361

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 130th Anniversary of Morehouse Appliances of New Hartford, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02369

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring the Youth Auxiliary Group of Al Tabari Court No. 28 upon the occasion of receiving the Excellence in the Community Award by the Schenectady City Council on June 24, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02360

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 200th Anniversary of Steuben Community Church on June 8, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02365

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Thomas Coyne upon the occasion of announcing his last Utica Comets hockey game on April 21, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02364

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 10th Anniversary of the Daniel Barden Mudfest in Deansboro, New York, on May 4, 2024