New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01250

Introduced
5/25/23  
Refer
5/25/23  
Report Pass
5/31/23  
Congratulating Robert A. Severance upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06890

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Establishes a missing persons unit within the division of state police; adds women to the responsibility of the missing and exploited children clearinghouse; provides that by January first, two-thousand twenty-five included in the curriculum for the training of law enforcement shall be missing and exploited women and missing and exploited women and children of color and indigenous descent; requires the reporting duties of law enforcement departments to include missing women, in addition to missing children and vulnerable adults; relates to the missing and exploited women and children clearinghouse fund; relates to the gift for missing and exploited women and children clearinghouse fund.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01038

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Commemorating the 56th Anniversary of the world famous African Record Center
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01035

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Commending Kevin Zhu upon the occasion of being named a 2023 United States Presidential Scholar
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01118

Introduced
5/19/23  
Refer
5/19/23  
Report Pass
5/23/23  
Mourning the death of Sally Johnston, a leader of the disability movement, distinguished citizen, and devoted member of her community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Assembly Bill A07410

Introduced
5/19/23  
Refer
5/19/23  
Report Pass
5/24/23  
Refer
5/24/23  
Report Pass
5/30/23  
Refer
5/30/23  
Report Pass
5/30/23  
Engrossed
5/31/23  
Refer
5/31/23  
Engrossed
6/8/23  
Enrolled
9/7/23  
Chaptered
9/11/23  
Designates a portion of state route 111 in the towns of Islip and Smithtown as the "Port Authority Police Officer Steven J. Tursellino Memorial Highway".
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01026

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Congratulating Caleb Sweet upon the occasion of capturing the 145-pound Division II wrestling title at the NYSPHSAA Wrestling Championships
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01007

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Recognizing June 28, 2023, as Steel Pan Day, in conjunction with the observance of National Caribbean-American Heritage Month
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01025

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/23/23  
Congratulating Angelina McKane upon the occasion of capturing the Girls 50-yard Freestyle title at the NYSPHSAA Girls Swimming and Diving Championship on November 19, 2022
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06878

Introduced
5/12/23  
Authorizes the state cemetery board to accept from the town of Clarkstown an application for funding from the state cemetery vandalism restoration, monument repair or removal and administration fund for three abandoned cemeteries.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06902

Introduced
5/15/23  
Refer
5/15/23  
Report Pass
5/23/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Authorizes the commissioner of health to increase rates by 11 percent for in-person early intervention services commencing July 1, 2024.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01031

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to declare May 2023, as Small Business Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01008

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/23/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 25, 2023, as Africa Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01039

Introduced
5/12/23  
Refer
5/12/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Mourning the death of Chief Warrant Officer Christopher Robert Eramo
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01029

Introduced
5/11/23  
Refer
5/11/23  
Report Pass
5/16/23  
Celebrating Mother's Day on May 14, 2023