New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02366

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Flour & Salt Cafe upon the occasion of its designation as recipient of the 2024 Madison County Small Business of the Year award by the New York Small Business Development Center on May 2, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09198

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/15/24  
Engrossed
6/3/24  
Relates to motions to vacate judgment; authorizes filing motions to vacate judgment for a conviction that was subsequently decriminalized; authorizes motions to vacate judgment to be filed at any time after entry of a judgment obtained at trial or by plea.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02368

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 125th Anniversary of the American Society of Landscape Architects and recognizing the enduring contributions of landscape architects to the well-being and prosperity of New York State
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02354

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 25th Annual World Falun Dafa Day Celebration, to be observed May 13, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02357

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Congratulating Liz Metzger upon the occasion of her retirement, as Director, after 28 years of distinguished service to the Canastota Public Library in Canastota, New York, on Sunday, June 30, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09190

Introduced
5/3/24  
Creates an advisory board to New York's office of the chief disability officer to review the office of the chief disability officer's operations and make recommendations relating to the office of the chief disability officer's policies and procedures.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02356

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Delta Lake Bible Conference Center of Rome, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02358

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Lieutenant Steven P. Fountain upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of the George M. Searle Memorial Award by the New York State Police Department on May 16, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02363

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 15th Anniversary of Oliveri's Pizzeria of Hamilton, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02355

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Dr. Michael "Doctuh" Woods upon the occasion of his retirement after many years of distinguished service to Hamilton College
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02362

Introduced
5/3/24  
Refer
5/3/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Congratulating Richard Dick L. Marley upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday on May 2, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02339

Introduced
5/1/24  
Refer
5/1/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commending the Bright Hope Lodge No. 62 upon the occasion of hosting its 20th annual Parade & Festival on June 8, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02337

Introduced
5/1/24  
Refer
5/1/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 53rd Anniversary of the Al Tabari Court No. 28 Illustrious Commandress Charity Ball, August 2-3, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02345

Introduced
5/1/24  
Refer
5/1/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 75th Anniversary of Mary Cariola Center
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09166

Introduced
5/2/24  
Appropriates $2,000,000 for capital improvements, including but not limited to structural and full remediation of the outside wall of the Kew Gardens, Lefferts Boulevard bridge.