New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01565

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2024, as Myalgic Encephalomyelitis/Chronic Fatigue Syndrome Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01561

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim March 22-28, 2024, as Doula Week in the State of New York, in conjunction with the observance of World Doula Week
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01463

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim January 27, 2024, as Holocaust Remembrance Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01464

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Larchmont Mamaroneck Lions Club
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01524

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim December 3, 2024, as International Day of Persons with Disabilities in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01519

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Commemorating the 54th Anniversary of Earth Day on April 22, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01497

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Commemorating the 50th Anniversary of The Kopernik Association of Utica, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01471

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Congratulating William J. Falk of Clinton, New York, upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday on August 20, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01492

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Oneida Public Library on April 30, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01487

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Commending Richard Waterman for his 50 years of dedication and participation with the Camden Continentals Fife & Drum Corps
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01541

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2, 2024, as Cancer Survivors Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01477

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Congratulating Sandra Jordan upon the occasion of her retirement as Deputy County Clerk after 27 years of distinguished service to Madison County, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S07957

Introduced
1/4/24  
Relates to creating the Brooklyn health care commission which shall be charged with examining the system of general hospitals, nursing homes, ambulatory and primary care facilities, and medical school facilities in Kings county and recommending changes to that system.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01486

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Honoring Volunteer Firefighter Ray Daviau upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition after 60 years of dedicated service to the Whitesboro Volunteer Fire Department
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J01544

Introduced
1/4/24  
Refer
1/4/24  
Report Pass
1/9/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 24, 2024, as Denim Day in the State of New York