LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Committees
Finance
Bills & Legislation
NY
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
New York 2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate Finance Committee
Bills & Legislation
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01489
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Honoring Dr. Bruce Stewart, DDS, upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of the 2023 Distinguished Service Award by the Greater Oneida Chamber of Commerce on October 27, 2023
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01467
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Congratulating Connor Dean upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Division I Pentathlon Championship
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01576
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 11-17, 2024, as Black Maternal Health Week in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01566
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 7, 2024, as Child Health Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01583
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 2024, as Blood Cancer Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01532
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim February 14, 2024, as Donor Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01494
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Commemorating the 200th Anniversary of the Town of Fenner, New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01571
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 10, 2024, as Encourage a Young Writer Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01518
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/23/24
Passed
1/23/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 2024, as Diabetic Eye Disease Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01483
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Honoring Eve Van de Wal upon the occasion of her retirement after 35 years of distinguished service to Excellus BlueCross BlueShield
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01573
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 2, 2024, as Vitamin D Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01530
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 2024, as Pancreatic Cancer Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01523
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Commemorating the 58th Anniversary of the Independence of Guyana
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01538
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Commemorating June 14, 2024, as Flag Day
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J01535
Introduced
1/4/24
Refer
1/4/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Passed
1/9/24
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 25, 2024, as Malaria Day in the State of New York
Page 141 of 259
141
142
143
144
145
146
147
148
149
150