New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02298

Introduced
4/24/24  
Refer
4/24/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Congratulating Kayleigh Reardon upon the occasion of earning the distinguished Gold Award, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Assembly Bill A09932

Introduced
4/26/24  
Refer
4/26/24  
Report Pass
5/29/24  
Refer
5/29/24  
Report Pass
5/30/24  
Engrossed
5/30/24  
Refer
5/30/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Enrolled
12/2/24  
Expands the authority of hearing officers regarding judgments about an employee's inability to perform their duties due to a disability to be provided to the employee and the authorized representative of such employee.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Assembly Bill A09919

Introduced
4/26/24  
Refer
4/26/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Refer
5/7/24  
Report Pass
5/20/24  
Refer
5/20/24  
Report Pass
5/22/24  
Engrossed
5/23/24  
Refer
5/23/24  
Engrossed
6/5/24  
Enrolled
11/15/24  
Chaptered
11/22/24  
Exempts certain other than for-profit community gardens from payment for water usage and supply; exempts non-profit community gardens located on property in the city of New York and licensed by or registered with such city's department of parks and recreation from payment for water usage and supply.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02313

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring James D. Thomas, Jr. upon the occasion of his induction into the Schenectady School District Athletic Hall of Fame
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02309

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Dave and Jess Shull upon the occasion of their designation as recipients of the Distinguished Citizen Award by the Baden-Powell Council, Boy Scouts of America on May 9, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02307

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2024, as Gun Violence Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02306

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Congratulating the Binghamton University Debate Team upon the occasion of capturing the Cross-Examination Debate Association's National Tournament Championship
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02305

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 100th Annual New York & Bermuda Lions Convention
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02310

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commending LifeSong, Inc. upon the occasion of hosting its 12th Annual LifeSong Dash 5k on June 8, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02304

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 150th Anniversary of the Village of Sleepy Hollow, New York, on May 20, 2024; and
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02314

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Ray Johnson upon the occasion of being inducted into the Schenectady School District Athletic Hall of Fame
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02311

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Honoring Tom Chestnut upon the occasion of being inducted into the Schenectady School District Athletic Hall of Fame
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02312

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Commemorating the 25th Anniversary of the Gerald B. H. Solomon Saratoga National Cemetery in Schuylerville, New York on July 9, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02308

Introduced
4/29/24  
Refer
4/29/24  
Report Pass
5/7/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 9, 2024, as Sneakers Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02321

Introduced
4/29/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 19, 2024, as Juneteenth Day in the State of New York