New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00219

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 7-13, 2023, as Teacher Appreciation Week in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00214

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 26, 2023, as Denim Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00250

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Recognizing February 2, 2023, as World Wetlands Day
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00180

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/24/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 7-13, 2023, as Correctional Officers and Employees Week in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00245

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 1, 2023, as International Day of Older Persons in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00220

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Commemorating June 14, 2023, as Flag Day
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00226

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 13-21, 2023, as Hunger and Homelessness Awareness Week in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00205

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 31, 2023, as Save Your Hearing Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S01291

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Establishes an annual cost of living adjustment for human services programs indexed to inflation.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00187

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Commemorating the Asian-American community's celebration of the Lunar New Year, the Year of the Rabbit, on January 22, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00193

Introduced
1/11/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Myalgic Encephalomyelitis/Chronic Fatigue Syndrome Awareness Month in New York State
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S01293

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/17/23  
Engrossed
5/30/23  
Refer
5/30/23  
Directs the department of public service to prepare written reports on the effect the COVID-19 state of emergency has on certain utilities of electric, gas, water, wastewater, and telephone service to commercial and residential customers in the state and on the affordability of services.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00195

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Muslim History Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00212

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim January 28, 2023, as Human Data Privacy Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00239

Introduced
1/11/23  
Refer
1/11/23  
Report Pass
1/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 2023, as Pulmonary Hypertension Awareness Month in the State of New York