LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Committees
Finance
Bills & Legislation
NY
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
New York 2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate Finance Committee
Bills & Legislation
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00209
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 2023, as Alopecia Areata Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00178
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 21-27, 2023, as Emergency Medical Services Week in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00185
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 17-23, 2023, as Telehealth Awareness Week in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00189
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim July 2023, as Fibroid Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S01313
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Refer
1/3/24
Provides that employees of the state police shall not be directed by executive order or regulations to not assist with the enforcement of federal laws.
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00200
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 10, 2023, as Grandparents Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00213
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Commending Grenada, Carriacou & Petite Martinique upon the occasion of its 49th Anniversary of Independence
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00204
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 5, 2023, as World Environment Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00207
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 20, 2023, as School Backpack Awareness Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00196
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim August 26, 2023, as Women's Equality Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00210
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim March 22, 2023, as Doula Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00199
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 14, 2023, as World Diabetes Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00177
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Commending John E. Hughes posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00229
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim November 2023, as Pancreatic Cancer Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00257
Introduced
1/11/23
Refer
1/11/23
Report Pass
1/18/23
Passed
1/18/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 2023, as Polish American Heritage Month in the State of New York
Page 19 of 259
19
20
21
22
23
24
25
26
27
28