New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02409

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commemorating the 110th Anniversary of O'Scugnizzo Pizzeria of Utica, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02401

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Congratulating Finbar James Galligan upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02417

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
commending Gregg "Gio" Giannotti upon the occasion of his designation as the 2024 Italian American of the Year by the New York Conference of Italian American State Legislators
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02407

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Honoring Maria Gaudelli upon the occasion of her retirement after many years of distinguished service to Saint Gregory the Great School
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02413

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commemorating the 60th Anniversary of Fania Records
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02402

Introduced
5/9/24  
Refer
5/9/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Congratulating Daniel Cornelius Egan upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09290

Introduced
5/9/24  
Designates February 21st as Mother Language Day, as a day of commemoration.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09292

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Lowers the period of probable usefulness of zero-emission school buses from twelve years to eight years.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02434

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commending the Saratoga-Wilton Elks Lodge No. 161 upon the occasion of hosting its 55th Annual Flag Day Parade on July 4, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02426

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 25, 2024, as Africa Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02429

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Congratulating Joseph Anthony Lettieri upon the occasion of celebrating his Ordination to the Sacred Order of the Priesthood on June 8, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02433

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commending the Burnt Hills-Ballston Lake Business and Professional Association upon the occasion of hosting its 23rd Annual Flag Day Parade on June 13, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02432

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Congratulating the members of the Hoosic Valley Odyssey of the Mind Teams upon the occasion of winning first place in New York State for their outstanding solutions to their respective problems
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02430

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commemorating the Centennial Anniversary of the Parish Public Library on May 30, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02436

Introduced
5/10/24  
Refer
5/10/24  
Report Pass
5/14/24  
Commemorating the 50th Anniversary of Disabled Persons Action Organization's Annual Concert Series