New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02193

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Mourning the death of Ronald B. Luposello, Sr., devoted family man, distinguished citizen, and dedicated member of his community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02117

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Commending the Jewish Community Relations Council of New York upon the occasion of hosting its Annual Gala on May 20, 2024, and paying tribute to this year's Honorees
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02119

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Mourning the death of Francine Varisco-Magnarelli, distinguished citizen and devoted member of her community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02115

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Commending National Action Network upon the occasion of hosting its 2024 National Action Network Convention Kick-Off Ribbon Cutting Ceremony on April 10, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02116

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Commending the Order of the Eastern Star Mystic Chapter upon the occasion of hosting its Annual Tea Luncheon Fundraiser on May 5, 2024, and paying tribute to this year's honoree, Worthy Matron Michelle Williams
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02114

Introduced
4/3/24  
Refer
4/3/24  
Report Pass
4/9/24  
Commending Hadji Court No. 62 of Buffalo, New York upon the occasion of hosting its Annual Illustrious Commandress Ball
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02089

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Commending Firefighter Richard Williams upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition after 60 years of dedicated service to the Clayville Fire Department
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02090

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Honoring Richard A. Duerr, Sr., upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition after many years of dedicated service to the Volunteer Fire Police Association of the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02088

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Mourning the death of John J. Cichocki, distinguished citizen and devoted member of his community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02086

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Mourning the death of James Maxwell, distinguished citizen and devoted member of his community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02084

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Commemorating the 20th Anniversary of 2-1-1 Backgrounder of United Way of Westchester and Putnam
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02093

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Recognizing Sunday, March 10, 2024, as Harriet Tubman Day
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02091

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Congratulating The Reverend James Cesta upon the occasion of celebrating the 50th Anniversary of his Ordination to the Priesthood
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02095

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Mourning the death of George L. Johansen, devoted husband and father, meritorious veteran, and distinguished New York State Trooper
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02092

Introduced
3/28/24  
Refer
3/28/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Congratulating the Utica-Notre Dame High School Girls Basketball Team upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Basketball Class B Championship on March 16, 2024