LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Committees
Finance
Bills & Legislation
NY
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
New York 2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate Finance Committee
Bills & Legislation
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00106
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 2023, as Breast Cancer Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00113
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 17, 2023, as Telecommunication and Information Society Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00138
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Commemorating Martin Luther King, Jr.'s Birthday on January 15, 2023
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00062
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim March 12, 2023, as Women of Color in Tech Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00071
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 11, 2023, as Children's Mental Health Awareness Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00161
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Mourning the death of Colvin O. Grannum, distinguished citizen and devoted member of his community
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00117
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim February 7, 2023, as Safer Internet Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00125
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 18, 2023, as Haitian Unity Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00030
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Congratulating Herbert C. Thorpe upon the occasion of celebrating his 100th Birthday
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00141
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim January 1, 2023, as World Day of Peace in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00022
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Honoring Suhru Wines upon the occasion of its designation as a Gold Medalist by the New York Wine and Grape Foundation on July 12, 2022
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00034
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Commemorating the 245th Anniversary of the Battle of Oriskany on August 6, 2022
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00150
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Healthy Vision Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00027
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Honoring Palmer Vineyards upon the occasion of its designation as a Gold Medalist by the New York Wine and Grape Foundation on July 12, 2022
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00121
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 21, 2023, as Eid al-Fitr Day in the State of New York
Page 38 of 259
38
39
40
41
42
43
44
45
46
47