New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02032

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating Hudson Montgomery upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Giant Slalom, Slalom, and Alpine Combined Championships on February 26 and 27, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02035

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating the Queensbury Boy's Nordic Relay Team upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Relay Nordic Ski Championship on February 27, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02033

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Commending the White Plains Public Library upon the occasion of hosting its 50-Year Celebration on May 4, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02036

Introduced
3/22/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Commending Abu Bekr Temple No. 91 Oasis of Brooklyn Desert of New York upon the occasion of hosting its Annual Potentates Ball
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02045

Introduced
3/22/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Honoring Frank Briggs upon the occasion of his induction into the Rome Arts Hall of Fame on May 5, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02031

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating Piper Dock upon the occasion of winning the NYSPHSAA Slalom Championship on February 26, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02027

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating the Stillwater High School Varsity Boys Basketball Team upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Boys Basketball Class B Championship on March 15, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02030

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating Ben Jenkin upon the occasion of capturing the 2023 NYSPHSAA Nordic Boys 7.5K Individual Championship
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02048

Introduced
3/22/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Honoring Linda Slavin upon the occasion of her induction into the Rome Arts Hall of Fame on May 5, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02039

Introduced
3/22/24  
Refer
3/22/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Honoring Lisa Fagan for her ceaseless dedication to the field of education, in conjunction with the observance of Teacher Appreciation Week
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02024

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Commemorating the 30th Anniversary of Nas' Illmatic album
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02028

Introduced
3/21/24  
Refer
3/21/24  
Report Pass
3/26/24  
Congratulating the Burnt Hills-Ballston Lake High School Girls Relay Team and Head Coach Megan James upon the occasion of capturing the 2024 New York State 4 x 400 Relay Federation Championship
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S08858

Introduced
3/21/24  
Requires the office of special investigation to conclude investigations into alleged criminal offenses committed by police officers resulting in a death and issue a report within sixty days.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02069

Introduced
3/27/24  
Refer
3/27/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Mourning the death of Robert J. Brauer III, distinguished citizen and devoted member of his community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02079

Introduced
3/27/24  
Refer
3/27/24  
Report Pass
4/3/24  
Commemorating the Anniversary celebration of the Birthday of the revered Lubavitcher Rebbe, Rabbi Menachem M. Schneerson