New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02648

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Congratulating the members of the Broadalbin-Perth High School Odyssey of the Mind team upon the occasion of their victory at the Odyssey of the Mind World Championship
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02646

Introduced
5/31/24  
Commending the Bosnian American Community Association for hosting the 3rd Annual Srebrenica Walk in Utica, New York, on July 11, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02644

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Commemorating the 28th Annual Capital Region Buddy Walk for Down Syndrome at Central Park in the City of Schenectady on September 29, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09820

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Refer
6/4/24  
Engrossed
6/7/24  
Enrolled
6/26/24  
Chaptered
6/28/24  
Provides for compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment of state officers and employees who are the members of the security supervisors unit; increases salary payable to certain officers and employees; authorizes funding of joint labor-management committees; implements an agreement between the state and the employee organization representing the members of the security supervisors unit.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09818

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Refer
6/4/24  
Engrossed
6/7/24  
Enrolled
6/26/24  
Chaptered
6/28/24  
Provides for compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment for members of the agency police services unit; implements an agreement between the state and the employee organization representing the members of the collective negotiating unit designated as the agency police services unit.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09821

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Refer
6/4/24  
Engrossed
6/7/24  
Enrolled
6/26/24  
Chaptered
6/28/24  
Relates to compensation, benefits and other terms and conditions of employment for members of the district council 37 rent regulation services unit; relates to location pay for certain state officers and employees; implements a collective bargaining agreement between the state of New York and the district council 37 rent regulation services unit; makes appropriations.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S09819

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Refer
6/4/24  
Engrossed
6/7/24  
Enrolled
6/26/24  
Chaptered
6/28/24  
Implements the provisions of a collective bargaining agreement binding the state of New York and the New York State Correctional Officers and Police Benevolent Association, Inc. ("NYSCOPBA"), representing members of the collective negotiating unit designated as the Security Services Unit for the period covering April 1, 2023 through March 31, 2025.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02643

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Mourning the death of Angela J. Filippone, distinguished citizen and devoted member of her community
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02647

Introduced
5/31/24  
Refer
5/31/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Congratulating the Elmont High School Boys Basketball Team upon the occasion of capturing the NYSPHSAA Basketball Class AA Championship on March 16, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02728

Introduced
9/23/24  
Commending Eric VanAuken upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02732

Introduced
9/23/24  
Commending Jose Cristales upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal, the highest honor bestowed upon an individual by the New York State Senate
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02633

Introduced
5/30/24  
Refer
5/30/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Commemorating the 40th Annual Michelle Adey Open on July 8, 2024, in Rome, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02627

Introduced
5/30/24  
Refer
5/30/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Congratulating Charles R. Gibbs II, Senior Buildings and Grounds Supervisor, upon the occasion of his retirement after more than 16 years of distinguished service to New York Power Authority
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02621

Introduced
5/30/24  
Refer
5/30/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Congratulating Taylor Farrell upon the occasion of winning the Girls 1-mile Race Walk Championship at the New Balance Indoor Nationals on March 8, 2024
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J02631

Introduced
5/30/24  
Refer
5/30/24  
Report Pass
6/4/24  
Commemorating the 52nd Annual Madison-Bouckville Antique Show, hosted August 12-18, 2024