New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00644

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commending Fleurimond Catering upon the occasion of hosting its 20th Annual Emerald Masquerade Ball on April 22, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00661

Introduced
3/29/23  
Commending the sisters from various New York unions and community organizations upon the occasion of hosting its Red Carpet for Social Justice event
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00646

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Congratulating Brian Liu upon the occasion of winning the ScholarSkills Long Island Spelling Bee on March 24, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00620

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 2023, as School Library Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00662

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commemorating the 50th Anniversary of Symeon's Greek Restaurant of Yorkville, New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00647

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2, 2023, as Queens Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00638

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim July 2023, as Minority Mental Health Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00634

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 16-22, 2023, as Volunteer Week in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00635

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Malayalee Heritage Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00654

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commending Firefighter Jeff Whitcomb upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition by the Sea Cliff Fire Department in honor of his prompt and heroic actions on March 5, 2022
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00653

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commending Firefighter William Richmond upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition by the Sea Cliff Fire Department in honor of his prompt and heroic actions on March 5, 2022
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00633

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 2023, as Sikh Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00656

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commending 2nd Lieutenant Brian Griffin upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition by the Sea Cliff Fire Department in honor of his prompt and heroic actions on March 5, 2022
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00639

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim August 15, 2023, as Indian Independence Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00637

Introduced
3/29/23  
Refer
3/29/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 27, 2023, as HIV Testing Day in the State of New York