New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00830

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Commemorating the 25th Anniversary of the Postpartum Resource Center of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00828

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 2023, as Hindu Heritage Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00826

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Commending the Most Worshipful Prince Hall, Grand Lodge of the State of New York upon the occasion of hosting its Gospel Arthur J. Harris Jr. Brunch on May 13, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06562

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Enacts the "taxpayer access to publicly funded research act"; defines terms; requires each agency that provides funding for direct research shall develop a public access policy.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00829

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim August 2023, as Ambulatory Surgery Center Month in the State of New York, in conjunction with the observance of National Ambulatory Surgery Center Month
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00856

Introduced
4/27/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 25, 2023, as El Dia Del Bodeguero in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06564

Introduced
4/26/23  
Refer
4/26/23  
Report Pass
5/23/23  
Engrossed
6/8/23  
Refer
6/8/23  
Engrossed
6/8/23  
Enrolled
6/26/23  
Chaptered
6/30/23  
Facilitates the marketing of any issue of serial bonds or notes of the city of Buffalo issued on or before June 30, 2024.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06593

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Enacts the "New York Business Emergency Relief Act of 2023"; directs the governor to use unallocated settlement funds reserved in the economic uncertainties, and any further settlement money received by the state or state surplus funds to pay the debt to the federal unemployment insurance trust fund.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00873

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/9/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim October 2023, as Bullying Prevention Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06600

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Requires law enforcement agencies to store physical or other evidence it maintains within fireproof containers or within a fireproof storage area; requires law enforcement agencies to document and photograph evidence before it is stored in a fireproof container or storage area; requires that such documents and photographs be stored in a different location.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00867

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Congratulating Brayden Fahrbach upon the occasion of capturing the 132-pound Division II wrestling title at the NYSPHSAA Wrestling Championships on February 25, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00870

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Commending LifeSong, Inc. upon the occasion of hosting its 11th Annual LifeSong Dash 5k on June 10, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00864

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Commending Not Another Child, Inc. upon the occasion of hosting its Pre-Mother's Day Celebration on May 6, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00872

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Honoring Gary Przybylo posthumously upon the occasion of his induction into the Schenectady City School District Athletic Hall of Fame on September 11, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00862

Introduced
4/28/23  
Refer
4/28/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Congratulating Rabbi Scott L. Shpeen upon the occasion of his retirement after 38 years of distinguished service to the Congregation Beth Emeth