LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Committees
Finance
Bills & Legislation
NY
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
New York 2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate Finance Committee
Bills & Legislation
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00093
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Memorializing Kathy Hochul to proclaim March 2023, as Pure New York State Maple Month
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00101
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2, 2023, as Gun Violence Awareness Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00026
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Honoring Sparkling Pointe upon the occasion of its designation as a Gold Medalist by the New York Wine and Grape Foundation on July 12, 2022
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00029
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Commending the Rome Lions Club upon the occasion of celebrating its 70th Anniversary on October 21, 2022
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00070
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 8, 2023, as Red Cross and Red Crescent Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00042
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Commemorating the 50th Anniversary of Franco's Pizza & Deli
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00153
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Recognizing Friday, March 10, 2023, as Harriet Tubman Day
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00144
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 3-9, 2023, as Maternal Health Awareness Week in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00151
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim January 4, 2023, as Braille Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00047
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Honoring James S. Staffo upon the occasion of his retirement after 50 years of distinguished service to the Herkimer and Oneida County Boards of Elections
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00035
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Commemorating the 105th Anniversary of Enjem's Flooring America of Utica, New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00081
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Asthma Awareness Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00089
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Cancer Research Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00072
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Recognizing May 10, 2023, as World Lupus Day
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00109
Introduced
1/5/23
Refer
1/5/23
Report Pass
1/10/23
Passed
1/10/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 10, 2023, as Siblings Day in the State of New York
Page 66 of 259
66
67
68
69
70
71
72
73
74
75