New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00775

Introduced
4/17/23  
Refer
4/17/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 11, 2023, as School Nurse Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00777

Introduced
4/17/23  
Refer
4/17/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Commending Megan and Clayton Kappauf upon the occasion of being named the 2023 Teachers of the Year by New York Agriculture in the Classroom
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00754

Introduced
4/17/23  
Refer
4/17/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Honoring Gary Edwards upon the occasion of being inducted into the National Wrestling Hall of Fame on September 24, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00755

Introduced
4/17/23  
Refer
4/17/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Congratulating Zachery Sirk upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00773

Introduced
4/17/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2023, as Caribbean American Heritage Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00774

Introduced
4/17/23  
Refer
4/17/23  
Report Pass
4/25/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 20, 2023, as World Refugee Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06044

Introduced
3/27/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Report Pass
5/21/24  
Engrossed
6/4/24  
Establishes fetal and infant mortality review boards to study fetal and infant mortality and morbidity and make recommendations on policies, best practices, and strategies to reduce fetal and infant mortality and morbidity.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06057

Introduced
3/27/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Requires state agencies to offer an option for a member of the public to speak to a live agency representative when contacting such agency.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06011

Introduced
3/27/23  
Refer
3/27/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Authorizes a study by the department of corrections and community supervision pertaining to the treatment of aging prison populations.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00693

Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/4/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commemorating the 200th Anniversary of the Town of Busti to be celebrated on April 16, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00685

Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/4/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Commemorating the 40th Anniversary of The Lesbian, Gay, Bisexual, & Transgender Community Center
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00692

Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/4/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 28, 2023, as Workers' Memorial Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00688

Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/4/23  
Report Pass
4/10/23  
Mourning the death of Shirley J. Hamilton, President of the Niagara Falls Branch of the NAACP, and longtime warrior for justice
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00686

Introduced
4/4/23  
Refer
4/4/23  
Report Pass
5/2/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 14-20, 2023, as Family Physician Week in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00687

Introduced
4/4/23  
Mourning the death of Dr. Julius Gregg Adams, former Executive Director of the University of Buffalo's Educational Opportunity Center, distinguished citizen, and devoted member of his community