New York 2009-2010 Regular Session

Senate Finance Committee Bills & Legislation

NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00749

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Commending Firefighter William J. Baker upon the occasion of his designation for special recognition after 50 years of dedicated service to the Lee Center Fire Department
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00748

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Honoring Ruth Fish upon the occasion of her designation as recipient of the 2023 Liberty Bell Award by the Warren County Bar Association on May 5, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00750

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Celebrating the courage and bravery of New York State's Korean War Veterans and recognizing the men and women who served with dignity and honor on April 26th, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00744

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Honoring Judge Donald F. Cerio Jr. upon the occasion of his retirement after over 40 years of distinguished service to Madison County
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06334

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Establishes the office of organized retail theft within the department of law to receive and investigate complaints from any source, or upon its own initiative, of allegations involving the use and role of organized retail theft.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00746

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Commemorating the 100th Anniversary of the Remsen Volunteer Fire Company Inc.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06333

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Provides for reimbursement of expenses for childcare and dependent care for volunteer members of public bodies.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00747

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Commending The Campaign Against Hunger upon the occasion of hosting its 12th Annual Planter Awards Gala, and paying tribute to this year's honorees
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00751

Introduced
4/14/23  
Refer
4/14/23  
Report Pass
4/18/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim April 2023, as the Month of the Military Child in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00944

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Report Pass
5/9/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim September 17, 2023, as Constitution Day and Citizenship Day in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06701

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Report Pass
5/17/23  
Engrossed
6/1/23  
Refer
6/1/23  
Refer
1/3/24  
Report Pass
1/17/24  
Engrossed
3/12/24  
Establishes the problem gambling advisory council.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00938

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Report Pass
5/9/23  
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2023, as Dairy Month in the State of New York
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill S06712

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Establishes a New York State Sound Basic Education Commission to study current educational needs and recommend a new foundation aid formula which will provide all students in the state a meaningful opportunity for a sound basic education in a cost efficient manner.
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00940

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Report Pass
5/9/23  
Congratulating Logan Decker upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors, on May 11, 2023
NY

New York 2023-2024 Regular Session

New York Senate Bill J00935

Introduced
5/5/23  
Refer
5/5/23  
Report Pass
5/9/23  
Congratulating Kayuta Drive-In upon the occasion of celebrating its 60th Anniversary on June 24, 2023