LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
New York NY
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Committees
Finance
Bills & Legislation
NY
Senate Finance Committee
Overview
Committee Members
Legislative Activity
Bills & Legislation
Calendar
New York 2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate Finance Committee
Bills & Legislation
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00763
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 12, 2023, as Filipino Independence Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00755
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Congratulating Zachery Sirk upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00773
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 2023, as Caribbean American Heritage Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00774
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim June 20, 2023, as World Refugee Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00762
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim July 2023, as Culinary Arts Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00775
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 11, 2023, as School Nurse Day in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00777
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Commending Megan and Clayton Kappauf upon the occasion of being named the 2023 Teachers of the Year by New York Agriculture in the Classroom
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00756
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Commending Cristo Rey Brooklyn High School upon the occasion of hosting its Annual Gala on May 9, 2023
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00769
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 2023, as Older New Yorkers Month in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00752
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Commending Robert R. Sherman posthumously upon the occasion of his designation as recipient of a Liberty Medal
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00753
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Congratulating Alexander Sirk upon the occasion of receiving the distinguished rank of Eagle Scout, the most prestigious of Scouting honors
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00754
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Report Pass
4/25/23
Passed
4/25/23
Honoring Gary Edwards upon the occasion of being inducted into the National Wrestling Hall of Fame on September 24, 2023
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00766
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Memorializing Governor Kathy Hochul to proclaim May 8-14, 2023, as Food Allergy Awareness Week in the State of New York
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill J00772
Introduced
4/17/23
Refer
4/17/23
Commemorating the 61st Anniversary of the Independence of Trinidad and Tobago
NY
New York 2023-2024 Regular Session
New York Senate Bill S06518
Introduced
4/25/23
Refer
4/25/23
Engrossed
5/15/23
Refer
5/15/23
Refer
1/3/24
Report Pass
1/9/24
Establishes a New York Main Street development center in the division of housing and community renewal.
Page 81 of 259
81
82
83
84
85
86
87
88
89
90