Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1777 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/13/2021

                     
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
HOUSE BILL 1777 	By: Conley 
 
 
 
 
 
AS INTRODUCED 
 
An Act relating to toxicology testing laboratories; 
amending 47 O.S. 2011, Section 759, as last amended 
by Section 1, Chapter 125, O. S.L. 2015 (47 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 759), which relates to the Board of 
Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence; modifying 
entities; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     47 O.S. 2011, Section 759, as last 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 125 , O.S.L. 2015 (47 O.S. Supp. 2020 , 
Section 759), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 759.  A.  There is hereby re -created, to continue until 
July 1, 2022, in accordance with the provisions of the Oklahoma 
Sunset Law, the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence to be 
composed of the following members beginning July 1, 2015: 
1.  The Dean of the Oklahoma State University College of 
Osteopathic Medicine, or a designee; 
2.  The Dean of the University of Oklahoma College of Medicine, 
or a designee;   
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  The Commissioner of Public Safety, or a designee; 
4.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, 
or a designee; 
5.  The State Commissioner of Health, or a designee; 
6.  The Director of the Council on Law Enforcement Education and 
Training, or a designee; 
7.  One certified peace officer who is a member of a local law 
enforcement agency selected by the Oklahoma Sheriffs and Peace 
Officers Association; and 
8.  One person selected by the Oklahoma Association of Chiefs of 
Police. 
Members shall serve without pay other than reimbursement of 
necessary and actual expenses as provided in the State Travel 
Reimbursement Act.  Each member shall receive an appointment in 
writing which shall become a permanent part of the records of the 
Board.  The chair and vice -chair shall be elected from the 
membership of the Board every two (2) years.  The Board is 
authorized to appoint a State Director of Tes ts for Alcohol and Drug 
Influence and other employees, including, but not limited to, 
persons to conduct training and provide administrative assistance as 
necessary for the performance of its functions, subject to available 
funding and authorized full -time equivalent employee limitations.  
The Board may expend appropriated funds for purposes consistent with 
Sections 751 through 761 of this title and Sections 301 through 308   
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
of Title 3 of the Oklahoma Statutes.  The Legislature shall 
appropriate funds to the Department of Public Safety for the support 
of the Board of Tests For Alcohol and Drug Influence Board of Tests 
for Alcohol and Drug Influence and its employees, if any.  Upon the 
transfer of any employees from the Alcohol Drug Countermeasures Unit 
of the Department of Public Safety to the Board of Tests For Alcohol 
and Drug Influence Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence on 
July 1, 2003, all funds of the Unit appropriated and budgeted shall 
be transferred to the Board, and may be budgeted and expe nded to 
support the functions and personnel of the Board. 
B.  Collection and analysis of a person’s blood, breath, saliva 
or urine, to be considered valid and admissible in evidence, whether 
performed by or at the direction of a law enforcement officer or at 
the request of the tested person, shall have been performed in 
compliance with the rules adopted by the Board of Tests for Alcohol 
and Drug Influence and by an individual possessing a valid permit 
issued by the Board for this purpose or shall have been performed by 
a laboratory accredited in Toxicology by the American Society of 
Crime Laboratory Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board 
(ASCLD/LAB) an accrediting body as described in Section 150.37 of 
Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes or accredited by the American 
Board of Forensic Toxicology (ABFT). 
C.  The Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence is 
authorized to approve laboratories for the analysis, provided by the   
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
provisions of this title, of specimens of blood, breath, saliva and 
urine, and to administer a program for regular monitoring of such 
laboratories.  The Board is authorized to prescribe uniform 
standards and conditions for, and to approve satisfactory methods, 
procedures, techniques, devices, equipment and records for tests and 
analyses and to prescribe and approve the requisite education and 
training for the performance of such tests and analyses.  The Board 
shall establish standards for and ascertain the qualifications and 
competence of individuals to administer and conduct such tests a nd 
analyses, and to issue permits to laboratories and to individuals 
which shall be subject to suspension or revocation at the discretion 
of the Board.  The Board is authorized to prescribe uniform 
standards, conditions, methods, procedures, techniques, de vices, 
equipment and records for the collection, handling, retention, 
storage, preservation and delivery of specimens of blood, breath, 
saliva and urine obtained for the purpose of determining the alcohol 
concentration thereof or the presence or concentrat ion of any other 
intoxicating substance therein.  The Board may take such other 
actions as may be reasonably necessary or appropriate to effectuate 
the purposes of Sections 751 through 761 of this title and Sections 
301 through 308 of Title 3 of the Oklaho ma Statutes, and may adopt, 
amend and repeal such other rules consistent with this chapter as 
the Board shall determine proper.  Laboratories accredited in 
Toxicology by the American Society of Crime Laboratory   
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 5 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board (ASC LD/LAB) an accrediting 
body as described in Section 150.37 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes or accredited by the American Board of Forensic Toxicology 
(ABFT) are exempt from the provisions of this subsection. 
D.  The Board shall promulgate rules adopti ng uniform standards 
and conditions and rules approving devices, equipment, methods, 
procedures, techniques, and records for screening tests administered 
for the purpose of determining the presence or concentration of 
alcohol or any other intoxicating subs tance in a person’s blood, 
breath, saliva or urine.  Such screening tests shall be performed in 
compliance with the rules adopted by the Board of Tests for Alcohol 
and Drug Influence. 
E.  The Board may set rules and charge appropriate fees for 
operations incidental to its required duties and responsibilities. 
F.  There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving 
fund for the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence to be 
designated the “Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence 
Revolving Fund”.  The fund shall be a continuing fund, not subject 
to fiscal year limitations, and shall consist of monies received 
pursuant to the provisions of subsection E of this section and any 
funds previously deposited in the Board of Tests for Alcohol and 
Drug Influence Revolving Fund.  All monies accruing to the credit of 
the fund are hereby appropriated and may be budgeted and expended by 
the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence for operating   
 
HB1777 HFLR 	Page 6 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
expenses of the Board.  Expenditures from the funds shall be made 
upon warrants issued by the State Treasurer against claims filed as 
prescribed by law with the Director of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services for approval and payment. 
G.  The provisions of subsections B and C of this section shall 
be retroactive. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ALCOHOL, TOBACCO AND CONTROLLED 
SUBSTANCES, dated 02/11/2021 - DO PASS.