Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1777 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/30/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 29, 2021 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1777 	By: Conley of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Weaver of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to toxicology testing laboratories; 
amending 47 O.S. 2011, Section 759, as last amended 
by Section 1, Chapter 125, O.S.L. 2015 (47 O.S. Supp. 
2020, Section 759), which relates to the Board of 
Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence; modifying 
entities; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     47 O.S. 2011, S ection 759, as last 
amended by Section 1, Chapter 125 , O.S.L. 2015 (47 O.S. Supp. 2020 , 
Section 759), is amended to read as follows: 
Section 759.  A.  There is hereby re -created, to continue until 
July 1, 2022, in accordance with the provisions of the Okla homa 
Sunset Law, the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence to be 
composed of the following members beginning July 1, 2015: 
1.  The Dean of the Oklahoma State University College of 
Osteopathic Medicine, or a designee; 
2.  The Dean of the University of Oklahoma College of Medicine, 
or a designee;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
3.  The Commissioner of Public Safety, or a designee; 
4.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, 
or a designee; 
5.  The State Commissi oner of Health, or a designee; 
6.  The Director of th e Council on Law Enforcement Education and 
Training, or a designee; 
7.  One certified peace officer who is a member of a local law 
enforcement agency selected by the Oklahoma Sheriffs and Peace 
Officers Association; and 
8.  One person selected by the Oklah oma Association of Chiefs of 
Police. 
Members shall serve without pay other than reimbursement of 
necessary and actual expenses as provided in the State Travel 
Reimbursement Act.  Each member shall receiv e an appointment in 
writing which shall become a perm anent part of the records of the 
Board.  The chair and vice -chair shall be elected from the 
membership of the Board every two (2) years.  The Board is 
authorized to appoint a State Director of Tests for Alcohol and Drug 
Influence and other employees, inclu ding, but not limited to, 
persons to conduct training and provide administrative assistance as 
necessary for the performance of its functions, subject to available 
funding and authorized full -time equivalent employee limitations.  
The Board may expend appr opriated funds for purposes consistent with 
Sections 751 through 761 of this title and Sections 301 through 308   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
of Title 3 of the Oklahoma Statutes.  The Legislature shall 
appropriate funds to the Depart ment of Public Safety for the support 
of the Board of Tests For for Alcohol and Drug Influence and its 
employees, if any.  Upon the transfer of any employees from the 
Alcohol Drug Countermeasures Unit of the Department of Public Safety 
to the Board of Tests For for Alcohol and Drug Influence on July 1, 
2003, all funds of the Unit appropriated and budgeted shall be 
transferred to the Board, and may be budgeted and expended to 
support the functions and personnel of the Board. 
B.  Collection and analysis of a person’s blood, breath, saliva 
or urine, to be consid ered valid and admissible in evidence, whether 
performed by or at the direction of a law enforcement officer or at 
the request of the tested person, shall have been performed in 
compliance with the rules adopted by the Board of Tests for Alcohol 
and Drug Influence and by an individual possessing a valid permit 
issued by the Board for this purpose or shall have been performed by 
a laboratory accredited in Toxicology by the American Society of 
Crime Laboratory Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board 
(ASCLD/LAB) an accrediting body as described in Section 150.37 of 
Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statutes or accredited by the American 
Board of Forensic Toxicology (ABFT). 
C.  The Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence is 
authorized to approve laboratories for t he analysis, provided by the 
provisions of this title, of specimens of blood, breath, saliva and   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
urine, and to administer a program for regular monitoring of such 
laboratories.  The Board is authorized t o prescribe uniform 
standards and conditions for, and to approve satisfactory methods, 
procedures, techniques, devices, equipment and records for tests and 
analyses and to prescribe and approve the requisite education and 
training for the performance of su ch tests and analyses.  The Board 
shall establish standards for and ascertain the qualifications and 
competence of individuals to administer and conduct such tests and 
analyses, and to issue permits to laboratories and to individuals 
which shall be subject to suspension or revocation at the discretion 
of the Board.  The Board is authorized to prescribe uniform 
standards, conditions, methods, procedures, techniques, devices, 
equipment and records for the collection, handling, retention, 
storage, preservation and delivery of specimens of blood, breath, 
saliva and urine obtained for the purpose of determining the alcohol 
concentration thereof or the presence or concentration of any other 
intoxicating substance therein.  The Board may take such other 
actions as may be reasonably necessary or appropriate to effectu ate 
the purposes of Sections 751 through 761 of this title and Sections 
301 through 308 of Title 3 of the Oklahoma Statutes, and may adopt, 
amend and repeal such other rules consistent with this chapter as 
the Board shall determine proper.  Laboratories ac credited in 
Toxicology by the American Society of Crime Laboratory 
Directors/Laboratory Accreditation Board (ASCLD/LAB) an accrediting   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
body as described in Section 150.37 of Title 74 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes or accredited by the American Board of Forensic Toxicology 
(ABFT) are exempt from the provisions of this subsection. 
D.  The Board shall promulgate rules adopting uniform standards 
and conditions and rules approving devices, equipment, methods, 
procedures, techniques, and records for screening tests adm inistered 
for the purpose of determining the presence or concentration of 
alcohol or any other intoxicating substance in a person’s blood, 
breath, saliva or urine.  Such screening tests shall be performe d in 
compliance with the rules adopted by the Board o f Tests for Alcohol 
and Drug Influence. 
E.  The Board may set rules and charge appropriate fees for 
operations incidental to its required duties and responsibilities. 
F.  There is hereby created in the S tate Treasury a revolving 
fund for the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence to be 
designated the "Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence 
Revolving Fund".  The fund shall be a continuing fund, not subject 
to fiscal year limitations, and shal l consist of monies received 
pursuant to the provisio ns of subsection E of this section and any 
funds previously deposited in the Board of Tests for Alcohol and 
Drug Influence Revolving Fund.  All monies accruing to the credit of 
the fund are hereby approp riated and may be budgeted and expended by 
the Board of Tests for Alcohol and Drug Influence for operating 
expenses of the Board.  Expenditures from the funds shall be made   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1777 SFLR 	Page 6 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
upon warrants issued by the State Treasurer against claims filed as 
prescribed by law with the Director of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services for approval and payment. 
G.  The provisions of subsections B and C of this section shall 
be retroactive. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON PUBLIC SAFETY 
March 29, 2021 - DO PASS