Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1892 Amended / Bill

Filed 02/24/2021

                     
 
HB1892 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 1892 	By: Boatman 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to human trafficking and child 
exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on 
Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child 
Exploitation; providing for membership and 
appointments; stating duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in 
Oklahoma; providing for recommendation s and report; 
stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; 
setting term for task force; providing travel 
reimbursements; providing for noncodification; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF T HE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
A.  There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention 
of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation .  There shall be twelve 
(12) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows:   
 
HB1892 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
1.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, 
or a designee; 
2.  The Attorney General, or a designee; 
3.  The Chair of the District Attorneys Council, or a desig nee; 
4.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and 
Dangerous Drugs Control, or a designee; 
5.  The Director of the Oklahoma Department of Human Services, 
or a designee; 
6.  The Executive Director of the Office of Juvenile Affairs, or 
a designee; 
7.  The Commissioner of the Oklahoma Department of Mental Health 
and Substance Abuse Services, or a designee; 
8.  The Commissioner of the State Department of Health, or a 
designee; 
9.  The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Association of Chiefs 
of Police, or a designee; 
10.  The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Sheriffs' 
Association, or a designee; 
11.  The President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma State Senate, or 
a designee; and 
12.  The Speaker of the Oklahoma House of Representatives, or a 
designee. 
B.  The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma.  The   
 
HB1892 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on 
methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of l aw enforcement 
or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, 
human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in 
identifying and interrupting websites that promote pornography and 
sexually explicit materials; and methods tha t develop and support 
community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse 
or prevent human trafficking, prostitution, sexual abuse or other 
factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution 
or child exploitation. 
C.  The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by 
August 1, 2021.  The Advisory Task Force shall begin meeting and 
continue studying until January 1, 2022.  A report of the findings 
and recommendations shall be presented to the President Pro Tempore 
of the Oklahoma State Senate, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House of 
Representatives and the Governor on or before February 1, 2022.  
Upon delivery of the report, the Advisory Task Force shall 
terminate. 
D.  Members of the Legislature shall receive travel 
reimbursements from their respective appointing authority.  
E.  Staff of the Oklahoma State Senate and Oklahoma House of 
Representatives shall jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task 
Force.     
 
HB1892 HFLR 	Page 4 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
F.  A Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 
1, 2021.  The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by 
majority vote of the members. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 02/24/2021 - DO PASS, 
As Amended.