SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR Page 1 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 SENATE FLOOR VERSION April 7, 2021 COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE FOR ENGROSSED HOUSE BILL NO. 1892 By: Boatman, Lawson and Bell of the House and Weaver, Bergstrom and Floyd of the Senate An Act relating to human traf ficking and child exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation; providing for membership and appointments; stating duty to study human trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in Oklahoma; providing for recommendatio ns and report; stating member appointment and initial meeting dates; setting term for task force ; providing travel reimbursements; providing for noncodification; providing an effective date; and declaring an emergency. BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law not to be codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: A. There is hereby cr eated an Advisory Tas k Force on Prevention of Human Trafficking and Child Explo itation. There shall be thirteen (13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 1. The Cabinet Secretary of Public Safety, or designee ; SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR Page 2 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 2. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Invest igation, or a designee; 3. The Attorney General, or a des ignee; 4. The Chair of the District Attorneys Council, or a designee; 5. The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and Dangerous Drugs Control, or a designee; 6. The Director of the Department of Human Services, or a designee; 7. The Executive Director of the Office of Juvenile Affairs, or a designee; 8. The Commissioner of the Department of Mental Health and Substance Abuse Services, or a designee; 9. The Commissioner of the State Depa rtment of Health, or a designee; 10. The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Association of Chiefs of Police, or a designee; 11. The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Sheriffs ’ Association, or a designee; 12. The President Pro Te mpore of the Senate, or a designee; and 13. The Speaker of the House of Representatives, or a designee. B. The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human trafficking, prostitution an d child exploitation in this state. The Advisory Task Force s hall make recommendations to the Legislatu re on methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR Page 3 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in identifying and interrupting websites that promote p ornography and sexually explicit materials; and methods that develop and support community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse or prevent human trafficking, prostitution , sexual abuse or other factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution or child exploitation. C. The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by August 1, 2021. The Advisory Task Force shal l begin meeting and continue studying until January 1, 2022. A report of the findings and recommendations shall be presented to the Pr esident Pro Tempore of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the Governor on or before February 1, 2022. Upon delivery of the report, the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. D. A majority of the members shall constitute a quorum fo r the purpose of conducting the business of the Advisory Task Force. E. Members of the Legislature shall receive travel reimbursements from their respective appointing authority in accordance with the State Travel Reimburs ement Act. F. A Senate member sh all call the initial meeting by September 1, 2021. The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by majority vote of the members. SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB1892 SFLR Page 4 (Bold face denotes Committee Amendments) 1 2 3 4 5 6 7 8 9 10 11 12 13 14 15 16 17 18 19 20 21 22 23 24 G. Staff of the Senate and House of Representatives shall jointly assist in staff ing the Advisory Task Force. SECTION 2. This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservation of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby declared to exist, by reason whereof t his act shall take effect and be in full force from and after its passage and approval. COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS April 7, 2021 - DO PASS AS AMENDED