Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1892 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2021

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1892 	By: Boatman, Lawson and Bell of 
the House 
 
  and 
 
  Weaver, Bergstrom, Floyd 
and Jett of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to human trafficking and child 
exploitation; creating the Advisory Task Force on 
Prevention of Human Tra fficking and Child 
Exploitation; providing for membership and 
appointments; stating duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in 
Oklahoma; providing for recommendations and report; 
stating member appointment and initial meeting d ates; 
setting term for task force; providing travel 
reimbursements; providing for noncodification; 
providing an effective date; and declaring an 
emergency.  
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Human trafficking and child exploitation 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
 
A.  There is hereby created an Advisory Task Force on Prevention 
of Human Trafficking and Child Exploitation.  There s hall be 
thirteen (13) members on the Advisory Task Force as follows: 
 
1.  The Cabinet Secretary of Public Safety, or a designee; 
 
2.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Investigation, 
or a designee;  ENR. H. B. NO. 1892 	Page 2 
 
3.  The Attorney General, or a designee; 
 
4.  The Chair of the District Attorneys Council, or a designee; 
 
5.  The Director of the Oklahoma State Bureau of Narcotics and 
Dangerous Drugs Control, or a designee; 
 
6.  The Director of the Department of Human Services, or a 
designee; 
 
7.  The Executive Dir ector of the Office of Juvenile Affairs, or 
a designee; 
 
8.  The Commissioner of the Department of Mental Health and 
Substance Abuse Services, or a designee; 
 
9.  The Commissioner of the State Department of Health, or a 
designee; 
 
10.  The Executive Direct or of the Oklahoma Association of 
Chiefs of Police, or a designee; 
 
11.  The Executive Director of the Oklahoma Sheriffs ' 
Association, or a designee; 
 
12.  The President Pro Tempore of the Senate, or a designee; and 
 
13.  The Speaker of the House of Repres entatives, or a designee. 
 
B.  The Advisory Task Force shall have the duty to study human 
trafficking, prostitution and child exploitation in this state.  The 
Advisory Task Force shall make recommendations to the Legislature on 
methods and laws to enhance and fund the efforts of law enforcement 
or community groups that are working to slow and stop prostitution, 
human trafficking or child exploitation; methods to assist in 
identifying and interrupting websites that promote pornography and 
sexually explicit materials; and methods that develop and support 
community groups working with victims to interrupt cycles of abuse 
or prevent human trafficking, prostitution, sexual abuse or other 
factors influential in perpetuating human trafficking, prostitution 
or child exploitation. 
 
C.  The Advisory Task Force shall have members appointed by 
August 1, 2021.  The Advisory Task Force shall begin meeting and  ENR. H. B. NO. 1892 	Page 3 
continue studying until January 1, 2022.  A report of the findings 
and recommendations shall be presented to the Pr esident Pro Tempore 
of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and the 
Governor on or before February 1, 2022.  Upon delivery of the 
report, the Advisory Task Force shall terminate. 
 
D.  A majority of the members shall constitute a quorum f or the 
purpose of conducting the business of the Advisory Task Force. 
 
E.  Members of the Legislature shall receive travel 
reimbursements from their respective appointing authority in 
accordance with the State Travel Reimbursement Act. 
 
F.  A Senate member shall call the initial meeting by September 
1, 2021.  The chair of the Advisory Task Force shall be appointed by 
majority vote of the members. 
 
G.  Staff of the Senate and House of Representatives shall 
jointly assist in staffing the Advisory Task Force. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof t his act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 1892 	Page 4 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the 3rd day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 21st day of April, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this _________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secr etary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________