Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1992 Comm Sub / Bill

Filed 04/07/2021

                     
 
Req. No. 2058 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
HOUSE BILL 1992 	By: Caldwell (Trey) and Talley 
of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Kidd of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Juvenile Code; 
amending Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L. 2017 (10A 
O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), which relates to 
juvenile centers; requiring the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs to provide certa in report; authorizing the 
Office of Juvenile A ffairs to enter into certain 
contracts; updating statutory reference; providing an 
effective date; and declaring an emer gency. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L . 
2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2-7-620), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 2-7-620. A. Concurrent with the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs (OJA) campus consolidation process as contemplated by this 
act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of this title , OJA is directed to 
develop, in collaboration with other executive branch ag encies and 
such other entities as OJA deems necessary in furtherance of the   
 
Req. No. 2058 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
requirements of this act Section 2-7-618 of this title, plans for 
the repurposing of the Southwest Oklahoma Juve nile Center and the 
Oklahoma Juvenile Center for Girls campuses.  Th e agency shall 
provide a report to the Governor, the Sp eaker of the Oklahoma House 
of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma 
State Senate on recommendations for futu re use of those facilities 
not later than March 31, 2018, or one hun dred eighty (180) days from 
such date if the provisions of this act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of 
this title become effective as law later than July 1, 2017. 
B.  No later than October 1, 2021, the OJA shall provide a 
report to the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives on the fea sibility of 
entering into a contract for or operating group homes of any level 
at the Southwest Oklahoma Juv enile Center campus located in Manitou, 
Oklahoma. 
C.  OJA may enter into a contract with any other state agenc y to 
allow for the placement of children or young adults in the custody 
of a state agency to reside and pa rticipate in any identified OJA -
contracted or -operated program or fac ility. 
D.  OJA may enter into a contract with any tribal nation or 
agency or department of the federal government, in consultation with 
and approval by the Governor and the Attorney General of this state, 
to allow for the plac ement of children and young ad ults in the 
custody of the tribal nati on or an agency or dep artment of the   
 
Req. No. 2058 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
federal government to reside and participate in any identified OJA -
contracted or -operated program or facility. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof thi s act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passa ge and approval. 
 
58-1-2058 TEK 4/7/2021 2:51:43 PM