Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1992 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 04/22/2021

                     
 
ENGR. S. A. TO ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED SENATE AMENDMENT 
TO 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1992 	By: Caldwell (Trey) and Talley 
of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Kidd of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to children; amending Section 3, 
Chapter 337, O.S.L. 2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 2-7-620), which relates to juvenile centers; 
providing for the operation of group homes at the 
Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center; g ranting the 
Office of Juvenile A ffairs authority to contract with 
state agencies; granting the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs authority to co ntract with any tribal nation 
and federal government entity; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
AMENDMENT NO. 1. Page 1, strike the title, enacting clause and 
entire bill and insert 
 
“An Act relating to the Oklahoma Juvenile Code; 
amending Section 3, C hapter 337, O.S.L. 2017 (10A 
O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), which relates to 
juvenile centers; requiring the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs to provide certain report; authorizing the 
Office of Juvenile Affairs to enter into certain 
contracts; updating stat utory reference; providing an 
effective date; and declaring an emergency. 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA:   
 
ENGR. S. A. TO ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L. 
2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 2-7-620.  A. Concurrent with the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs (OJA) campus consolidation process as contemplated by this 
act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of this title , OJA is directed to 
develop, in collaboration with other executive branch agencies and 
such other entities as OJA deems necessary in furtherance of the 
requirements of this act Section 2-7-618 of this title, plans for 
the repurposing of the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center and the 
Oklahoma Juvenile Center for Girls campuses.  The agency shall 
provide a report to the Governor, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House 
of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma 
State Senate on recommendations for future use of those facilities 
not later than March 3 1, 2018, or one hundred eighty (180) days from 
such date if the provisions of this act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of 
this title become effective as law later than July 1, 2017. 
B.  No later than October 1, 2021, the OJA shall provide a 
report to the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives on the feasibility of 
entering into a contract for or operating group homes of any level 
at the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center campus located in Manitou, 
Oklahoma. 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021.   
 
ENGR. S. A. TO ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof th is act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. ” 
 
Passed the Senate the 21st day of April, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
Passed the House of Representatives the ____ day of __________, 
2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1992 	By: Caldwell (Trey) and Talley 
of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Kidd of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to children; amending Section 3, 
Chapter 337, O.S.L. 2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, 
Section 2-7-620), which relates to juvenile centers; 
providing for the operation of group homes at the 
Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center; g ranting the 
Office of Juvenile A ffairs authority to contract with 
state agencies; granting the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs authority to contract with any tribal nation 
and federal government entity; and providing an 
effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 4.     AMENDATORY     Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L. 
2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 2-7-620. A. Concurrent with the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs (OJA) campus consolidation process as contemplated by this 
act, OJA is directed to develop, in collaboration with othe r 
executive branch agencies and such other entities as OJA deems 
necessary in furtherance of the requirements of this act, plans for 
the repurposing of the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center and the   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Oklahoma Juvenile Center for Girls campuses.  The agency shall 
provide a report to the Governor, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House 
of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma 
State Senate on recommendations for future use of those facilities 
not later than March 31, 2018, or one hundred eigh ty (180) days from 
such date if the provisions of this act become effective as law 
later than July 1, 2017. 
B.  The Office of Juvenile Affairs may contract for and/or 
operate group homes of any level at the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile 
Center campus located in Manitou, Oklahoma. 
C.  OJA may contract with any other state agencies to allow for 
the placement of children or young adults in the custody of a state 
agency to reside and pa rticipate in any identified OJA -contracted or 
-operated program or facility. 
D.  OJA may contract with any tribal nation and/or agency or 
department of the federal government, in consultation with and 
approval by the Governor and the Oklahoma Attorney General, to allow 
for the placement of children and young adults in the custody of the 
tribal nation or an agency or department of federal government to 
reside and participate in any identified OJA -contracted or -operated 
program or facility. 
SECTION 5.  This act shall become effective November 1, 2021. 
   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Passed the House of Representatives the 8th day of March, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate