Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB1992 Enrolled / Bill

Filed 05/04/2021

                    An Act 
ENROLLED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 1992 	By: Caldwell (Trey) and Talley 
of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Kidd of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Juvenile Code; 
amending Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L. 2017 (10A 
O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), which relates t o 
juvenile centers; requiring the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs to provide certain report; authorizing the 
Office of Juvenile Affairs to enter into certain 
contracts; updating statutory reference; providing an 
effective date; and declaring an emergency.  
 
 
 
 
SUBJECT: Oklahoma Juvenile Code 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     Section 3, Chapter 337, O.S.L. 
2017 (10A O.S. Supp. 2020, Section 2 -7-620), is amended to read as 
follows: 
 
Section 2-7-620.  A. Concurrent with the Office of Juvenile 
Affairs (OJA) campus consolidation process as contemplated by this 
act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of this title , OJA is directed to 
develop, in collaboration with other executive branch agencies and 
such other entities as OJA deems necessary in furtherance of the 
requirements of this act Section 2-7-618 of this title, plans for 
the repurposing of the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center and the 
Oklahoma Juvenile Center for Girls campuses.  The agency shall 
provide a report to the Governor, the Speaker of the Oklahoma House 
of Representatives and the President Pro Tempore of the Oklahoma 
State Senate on recommendations for future use of those facilities 
not later than March 31, 2018, or one hundred eighty (180) days from  ENR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 2 
such date if the provisions of this act Section 2-7-618 et seq. of 
this title become effective as law later than July 1, 2017. 
 
B.  No later than October 1, 2021, the OJA shall provide a 
report to the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate and 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives on the feasibility of 
entering into a contract for or operating group homes of any level 
at the Southwest Oklahoma Juvenile Center campus located in Manitou, 
Oklahoma. 
 
SECTION 2.  This act shall become effective July 1, 2021. 
 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
  ENR. H. B. NO. 1992 	Page 3 
Passed the House of Representatives the 3rd day of May, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the 21st day of April, 2021. 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
OFFICE OF THE GOVERNOR 
Received by the Office of the Governor this ____________________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________ 
Approved by the Governor of the State of Oklahoma this ___ ______ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
 
 
 	_________________________________ 
 	Governor of the State of Oklahoma 
 
OFFICE OF THE SECRETARY OF STATE 
Received by the Office of the Secretary of State this __________ 
day of ___________________, 20_______, at _______ o'clock _______ M. 
By: _________________________________