Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2083 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/01/2021

                     
 
HB2083 HFLR 	Page 1 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES - FLOOR VERSION 
 
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
1st Session of the 58th Legislature (2021) 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR 
HOUSE BILL NO. 2083 	By: McCall, O'Donnell and 
Wallace 
 
 
 
 
 
 
COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxation; pro viding 
for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant 
to Oklahoma Income Tax Code; specifying amount of 
deduction; specifying taxable years for which 
deduction is authorized; stating legislative intent 
with respect to corporate income tax revenue; 
providing for noncodification; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2358.101 of Title 68, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, there 
shall be allowed as a deduction from the Oklahoma taxable income 
amount computed pursuant to Section 2358 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes or from the amount of income subject to the levy of tax   
 
HB2083 HFLR 	Page 2 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
imposed pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes for any corporation subject to the levy of income tax 
imposed pursuant to subsec tion E or F of Section 2355 of Title 68 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes in the following amounts: 
1.  Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, and 
before January 1, 2023; 
2.  Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, and 
before January 1, 2024; 
3.  Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023 , and 
before January 1, 2025; 
4.  Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and 
before January 1, 2026; and 
5.  One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable 
income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 
2026. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
It is the intent of the Legislature to make modifications to 
offset potential revenue losses, should they occur, reasonably 
attributable to the reduction of Oklahoma taxable income amounts for   
 
HB2083 HFLR 	Page 3 
BOLD FACE denotes Committee Amendments.  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
corporations provided by Section 1 of this act and to provide a 
system to ensure that revenues apportioned to the Education Refor m 
Revolving Fund, the Teachers' Retirement System, and the Ad Valorem 
Reimbursement Fund are not adversely affected. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. 
 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON RULES, dated 03/01/2021 - DO PASS, 
As Amended and Coauthored.