Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2083 Engrossed / Bill

Filed 03/15/2021

                     
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2083 	By: McCall, O'Donnell, Wallace, 
Davis, Lowe (Dick), Osbu rn, 
Marti, McDugle, Sneed, 
Dempsey, Sims, Bashore, 
Williams, Russ, Hill and 
Dills of the House 
 
  and 
 
  Daniels of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to revenue and taxati on; providing 
for deduction from taxable income computed pursuant 
to Oklahoma Income Tax Code; specifying amount of 
deduction; specifying taxable years for which 
deduction is authorized; stating legislative intent 
with respect to corporate income tax reven ue; 
providing for noncodification; providing for 
codification; and providing an effective date. 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statute s as Section 2358.101 of Title 68, unless 
there is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
For taxable years beginning on or after January 1, 2022, there 
shall be allowed as a deduction from the Oklahoma taxable income 
amount computed pursuan t to Section 2358 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes or from the amount of income subject to the levy of tax 
imposed pursuant to Section 2370 of Title 68 of the Oklahoma 
Statutes for any corporation subject to the levy of income tax   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
imposed pursuant to s ubsection E or F of Section 2355 of Title 68 of 
the Oklahoma Statutes in the following amounts: 
1.  Twenty percent (20%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2021, and 
before January 1, 2023; 
2.  Forty percent (40%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2022, and 
before January 1, 2024; 
3.  Sixty percent (60%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2023, and 
before January 1, 2025; 
4.  Eighty percent (80%) of the total Oklahoma taxable income 
amount for a taxable year beginning after December 31, 2024, and 
before January 1, 2026; and 
5.  One hundred percent (100%) of the total Oklahoma taxable 
income amount for any taxable year beginning on or after January 1, 
2026. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law not to be 
codified in the Oklahoma Statutes reads as follows: 
It is the intent of the Legislature to make modifications to 
offset potential revenue losses, should they occur, reasonably 
attributable to the reduction of Oklahoma taxable income amounts for 
corporations provided by Section 1 of this act and to provide a 
system to ensure that revenues apportioned to the Education Reform   
 
ENGR. H. B. NO. 2083 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Revolving Fund, the Teachers' Retirement System, and the Ad Valorem 
Reimbursement Fund are not adversely affected. 
SECTION 3.  This act shall become effective January 1, 2022. 
Passed the House of Representatives the 11th day of March, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the House 
 	of Representatives 
 
 
Passed the Senate the ___ day of __________, 2021. 
 
 
 
  
 	Presiding Officer of the Senate