Oklahoma 2022 2022 Regular Session

Oklahoma House Bill HB2296 Amended / Bill

Filed 03/29/2021

                     
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
March 25, 2021 
 
 
ENGROSSED HOUSE 
BILL NO. 2296 	By: Roberts (Dustin) of the 
House 
 
  and 
 
  Bullard of the Senate 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Red River Boundary Commission; 
re-creating Commission; providing for membership of 
Commission; specifying members will serve wit hout 
compensation; authorizing members to designate a 
representative; specifying reimbursement methods; 
providing for selection of chairperson; requiring 
meeting; prescribing scope of Commission; requiring 
report; specifying deadline for report; providing for 
termination of Commission; providing certain 
exemption from Oklahoma Sunset Law; authorizing 
Governor to request commission from the State of 
Texas; providing for codification; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE O F OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6110 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads a s follows: 
A.  A Red River Boundary Commission is he reby re-created. 
B.  The Commission shall consist of the following persons: 
1.  The Governor or his or her designee;   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
2.  The Lieutenant Governor or his or her designee; 
3.  The Attorney General or his or her designee; 
4.  The President Pro Tempore of the Senate or his or her 
designee; and 
5.  The Speaker of the House of Representatives or his or her 
designee. 
C.  Members of the Commission shall serve without additional 
compensation, each of whom may from t ime to time serve by and 
through a person designated by the member in writing for that 
purpose.  Legislative members shall receive reimbursement from the 
house in which they serve pursuant to the provisions of Section 456 
of Title 74 of the Oklahoma Statut es.  Other members of the 
Commission who are state employees shall receive reimbursement 
pursuant to the State Travel Reimbursement Act from the funds of 
their employing agency. 
D.  Staffing for the Commission shall be provided by t he 
Legislative Service B ureau. 
SECTION 2.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6111 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
The chairperson of the Red River Boundary Comm ission shall be 
jointly appointed by the Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the 
Senate and the Speaker of the House of Representatives from the 
Commission members identified in Section 1 of this act no later than   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
thirty (30) days after the effective da te of this act.  The first 
meeting of the Red River Boundary Commission, as re -created in 
Section 1 of this act, shall be held at the call of the chairperson 
but no later than December 31, 2021. 
SECTION 3.     NEW LAW     A new section of l aw to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6112 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
A.  The Red River Boundary Commission shall confer and act in 
conjunction with the represe ntatives to be appointed on behalf of 
the State of Texas for the following purposes: 
1.  To evaluate the methods, surveys, historical maps and other 
information used to establish the boundary line between this state 
and the State of Texas in the Texoma Ar ea, as such area is defin ed 
in the Texoma Area Boundary Agreement; 
2.  To determine the location of the south bank of the Red River 
as the bank was located and marked by the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers before the beginning of construction of Lake Texoma, in 
accordance with subsection C of Article II of Section 6106 of Title 
74 of the Oklahoma Statutes; 
3.  To redraw the boundary line between this state and the State 
of Texas on any real property for which the United States Army Corps 
of Engineers granted an easement, prio r to August 31, 2000, to at 
least two districts or authorities created under Section 59 of 
Article XVI of the Texas Constitution for the construction,   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 4 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
operation, and maintenance of a water pipeline and related 
facilities in the Tex oma Area in order to nega te any effects the 
boundary as it is currently drawn has on property interests 
associated with such easements in the Texoma Area, and to redraw the 
boundary on such real property so that there is no net loss of 
property between eit her state so as to ensure that the redrawn 
boundary does not increase the political power or influence of 
either state, in accordance with: 
a. the Lake Texoma preconstruction survey of the south 
bank of the Red River prepared by the United States 
Army Corps of Engineers, or 
b. other historical records or documentation of the 
United States Army Corps of Engineers identifying the 
location of the south bank of the Red River, if the 
survey described by subparagraph a of this paragraph 
is unavailable; 
4.  To hold hearings and conference s in this state and in the 
State of Texas as necessary to accomplish the purposes of this act; 
and 
5.  To take other action, alone or in cooperation with the State 
of Texas or the United States, necessary to accomplish the purposes 
of this act. 
B.  No later than January 15, 2022, the Commission shall report 
to the Governor, the Lieutenant Governor, the President Pro Tempore   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 5 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
of the Senate, the Speaker of the House of Representatives and 
appropriate committees of the Legislature the Commission's findings 
and recommendations concerning joint action by this state and the 
State of Texas regarding the amendment of the Texoma Area Boundary 
Agreement to incorporate the boundary between this state and the 
State of Texas in the Texoma Area as redrawn.  No later than J uly 
30, 2025, the Commission shall issue a final report to the Governor, 
the Lieutenant Governor, the President Pro Tempore of the Senate, 
the Speaker of the House of Representatives and appropriate 
committees of the Legislature. 
SECTION 4.    NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6113 of Title 74, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows: 
The Red River Boundary Commission shall terminate up on the date 
mutually agreed upon by a majority of the members of the Commission 
pursuant to a formal motion for dissolution of the Commission after 
its business has concluded.  The provisions of Section 3921 of Title 
74 of the Oklahoma Statutes shall not a pply to the Red River 
Boundary Commission and the Commission may be dissolved only as 
provided by this section. 
SECTION 5.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 6114 of Title 74, unless ther e 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads as follows:   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - HB2296 SFLR 	Page 6 
(Bold face denotes Committee Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
The Governor of the State of Oklahoma is empowered and requested 
to forward a copy of this act to the Governor of the State of Texas 
and to request that the Governor or legislature of that state 
appoint representatives of th e State of Texas to confer and act in 
conjunction with the Commission for the purposes specified in this 
act, with the understanding that each state will pay all expenses of 
its respective representatives. 
SECTION 6.  It being immediately n ecessary for the preservation 
of the public peace, health or safety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its passage and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON ENER GY 
March 25, 2021 - DO PASS